King v. Simpro Software Ltd
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia K Demarchi |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-04347 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Santa Clara County Superior Court, 24CV440673 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 3:07 AM PDT |
Defendant
Simpro Software Ltd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia King
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/22 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra R. Volpicelli (Volpicelli, Alexandra) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 07/19 9:56 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/2/2024. (mbc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Simpro Software Ltd re2 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Notice of Removal,, Served on July 18, 2024 (Brown, Jason) | |
2 | 2 Certificate of Interested Entities by Simpro Software Ltd identifying Corporate Parent SimPRO Group Pty Ltd for Simpro Software Ltd. and Corporate Disclosure Statement (Brown, Jason) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Santa Clara County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV440673. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19636248). Filed by Simpro Software Ltd.(Brown, Jason) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Sara Patterson, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Jason P. Brown, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix of State Court Pleadings, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A (Plf Summons and Complaint), | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B (Plf Proof of Service re Substituted Service), | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit C (Def Answer to Complaint), | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit D (Def Notice to Adverse Party re Removal), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit E (Def Notice to Court re Removal) |