Dempsey v. Hanson
Oregon District Court | |
Judge: | Ann L Aiken |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-01173 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
1 - Scheduling Show Cause
Thu 08/29 3:18 PM
Scheduling Order regarding Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 22541 . Petitioner ordered to Show Cause in Writing by 9/30/2024 why the Petition should not be summarily dismissed. Signed on 8/29/2024 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 8/29/2024.) (le) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
oth_doc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 08/07 12:36 PM
Filing Fee in amount of $5.00 collected; Receipt No. 108167 issued. (ljp) |
||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
1 - Scheduling
Mon 07/29 9:25 AM
ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Petitioner's application reveals that he can afford the $5.00 filing fee, and his Application for Leave to Proceed IFP2 is DENIED. Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel3 is DENIED with leave to renew if the case proceeds and Respondent is required to file an Answer. Within thirty days from the date of this Order, Petitioner shall submit the $5.00 filing fee. Petitioner is advised that the failure to pay the filing fee will result in dismissal of this action,without prejudice. Signed on 7/29/2024 by Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/29/2024.) (le) |
|
Friday, July 19, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
oth_evt
Case Assignment Notice - FORM EVENT
Fri 07/19 10:55 AM
Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ann L. Aiken. (Deposited in outgoing mail to pro se party on 7/19/24.) (eo) |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Appoint Counsel
Fri 07/19 10:55 AM
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Troy Caje Dempsey. (eo) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP
Fri 07/19 10:52 AM
Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Troy Caje Dempsey. (eo) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Petition - Writ of Habeas Corpus - 2254
Fri 07/19 10:51 AM
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2254 - State) (IFP Submitted) . Filed by Troy Caje Dempsey against Jason Hanson. (eo) |