DiCesare v. Cherokee Nation, et al
Original Case: 4:24-cv-00295
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-05085 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 20, 2024 2:19 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
THE CHEROKEE NATION
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID BECK
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID POINDEXTER
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
JAKE CALLIHAN
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
JOSEPH ANGELO DICESARE
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 07/20/2024 2:19 AM MDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
[11105468] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/17/2024. Notice of appearance due on 08/16/2024 for Joseph DiCesare. 24-5085 | ||
Att: 1 13 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas |