Briscoe v. Amazon.com Services, et al
Original Case: 2:23-cv-02481
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-03099 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Friday Aug 23, 2024 6:02 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GAVIN HEPBURN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN WARF
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SILVIA VALDEZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RYAN JOHNSTON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THEUNIS KOTZE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BETHANY REYES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GENELLE ROSE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JASMINE KAMMER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KRIS BRISCOE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 22 2024
[11114793] Default. Procedural termination without judicial action by the Clerk of the Court. [24-3099] |
Docket last updated: 08/23/2024 6:02 AM MDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
[11105493] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/17/2024. Fee and notice of appearance is due by 08/16/2024 for Kris Briscoe. Notice of appearance due on 07/31/2024 for Amazon.com Services LLC, Gavin Hepburn, Ryan Johnston, Jasmine Kammer, Theunis Kotze, Bethany Reyes, Genelle Rose, Silvia Valdez and Kevin Warf, Disclosure statement due on 07/31/2024 for Amazon.com Services LLC. 24-3099 | ||
Att: 1 21 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas |