Briscoe v. Amazon.com, et al
Original Case: 2:24-cv-02257
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-03100 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 4:39 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
AMAZON.COM, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
AMAZON.COM SERVICES LLC
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
GAVIN HEPBURN, Regional Service Leader, Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN WARF, MHLS Team Leader, Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
SILVIA VALDEZ, MHLS Team Leader, Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
RYAN JOHNSTON, Investigator, Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
THEUNIS KOTZE, Senior Manager, Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
BETHANY REYES, Head of ERC (MHLS), Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
GENELLE ROSE, Team Lead, Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
JASMINE KAMMER, HR Business Partner, Individually, Amazon.com Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
KRIS BRISCOE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 23 2024
[11114906] Jurisdictional Defect. Procedural termination after other judicial action. Written, unsigned, and unpublished. Judges Matheson, Phillips, and McHugh. [24-3100, 24-3106] |
Docket last updated: 08/27/2024 4:39 AM MDT |
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
[11105583] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 07/17/2024 Notice of appearance and fee or ifp forms due 08/16/2024 for Kris Briscoe. 24-3100 | ||
Att: 1 39 pgs Prelim ROA | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil Habeas |