Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02567
Case Filed:Jun 21, 2024
Terminated:Jul 18, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jul 21, 2024 2:23 AM CDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop (1)
Terminated: 07/18/2024
Represented By
Tyrone Thelonious Mansfield
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/21/2024 3:04 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
Arrest of Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop (em)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: No Bond Set as to Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop. (em)
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop. (em)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Duty Pub. Defender-El Paso for Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em)
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop held on 6/21/2024; Interpreter: L. Quevedo (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop (Court Reporter ero.) (em)
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER as to Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop, ( Detention Hearing set for 6/26/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda; Preliminary Hearing set for 6/26/2024 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Lazaro Alfredo De Leon-Ixchop. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (em)
Related: [-]