Schweitzer v. 3M Company et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Joan N Ericksen |
Referred: | David T Schultz |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02826 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Sep 03, 2024 3:26 AM CDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Schweitzer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case
Mon 07/22 8:54 AM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . (ABR) |
|
4 | 4
order
MDL Pretrial Order
Mon 07/22 8:53 AM
MDL PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(ABR) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 8:51 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (ABR) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 07/22 8:50 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 24-cv-2826 (JNE/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (ABR) |
|
Saturday, July 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
5
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Sat 07/20 11:26 PM
COMPLAINT Steven Schweitzer against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11205590) filed by Steven Schweitzer. Filer requests summons issued. (Assaad, Gabriel) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |