DB COMMUNICATIONS LLC D/B/A MULTIPLY v. X CORP.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Rita F Lin |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04402 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jul 21, 2024 |
Case in other court: | N/A, N/A |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 2:48 AM PDT |
Counter-claimant
X Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Counter-defendant
DB Communications LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
X Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DB Communications LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 08/30 4:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM / Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint and Counterclaims against DB Communications LLC by X Corp..(Bannigan, Megan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Trademark Application, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Statement of Use and Specimen, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Registration Certificate, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Assignment and Agreement, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Examiner XSearch Summary | ||
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 08/26 1:12 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by X Corp. identifying Corporate Parent X Holdings Corp. for X Corp.. (Bernstein, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Tue 08/13 11:38 AM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint, / Joint Stipulation Regarding Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading filed by X Corp.. (Bernstein, David) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/12 3:53 PM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 22 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Daniel Cohen. (mkl, COURT STAFF) |
|
25 | 25
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/12 3:52 PM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 21 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Nicole Flores. (mkl, COURT STAFF) |
|
24 | 24
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/12 3:50 PM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 20 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jared Kagan. (mkl, COURT STAFF) |
|
23 | 23
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/12 3:48 PM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 19 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Megan Bannigan. (mkl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/09 7:35 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / as to Daniel N. Cohen ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19713228.) filed by X Corp.. (Cohen, Daniel) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/09 7:24 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / as to Nicole M. Flores ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19713219.) filed by X Corp.. (Flores, Nicole) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/09 7:16 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / as to Jared I. Kagan ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19713203.) filed by X Corp.. (Kagan, Jared) |
|
19 | 19
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/09 7:03 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice / as to Megan K. Bannigan ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19713171.) filed by X Corp.. (Bannigan, Megan) |
|
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/09 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David H. Bernstein on behalf of Defendant X Corp. (Bernstein, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/06 7:46 AM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Jared Butcher. (mkl, COURT STAFF) |
|
16 | 16
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/06 7:44 AM
ORDER by Judge Rita F. Lin granting 13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Brandon Levitt. (mkl, COURT STAFF) |
|
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Tue 08/06 7:27 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT: Notice is hereby given that an Initial Case Management Conference is set before Judge Rita F. Lin upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Lin's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] . Case Management Statement due by 10/16/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/23/2024 10:00 AM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges/lin-rita-f-rfl/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/05 1:45 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19692992.) filed by DB Communications LLC. (Butcher, Jared) |
|
13 | 13
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Mon 08/05 1:41 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19692946.) filed by DB Communications LLC. (Levitt, Brandon) |
|
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/05 10:00 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Rita F. Lin for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Virginia K. DeMarchi no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.(smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Mon 08/05 9:47 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (amk, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/05 9:35 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by DB Communications LLC.. (Harabedian, John) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding (cc: form mailed to register). (Wesley, Keith) | |
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by DB COMMUNICATIONS LLC D/B/A MULTIPLY identifying Corporate Parent DB Communications LLC d/g/a Multiply, Plaintiff, Virginia LLC with its principal place of business in Albemarle County, Virginia, Corporate Parent X Corp., Defendant, Nevada corporation with its principal place of business in San Francisco, California for DB COMMUNICATIONS LLC D/B/A MULTIPLY. re1 Complaint (Wesley, Keith) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Wesley, Keith) | |
Sunday, July 21, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 24 pgs COMPLAINT against X CORP. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19642394.). Filed by DB COMMUNICATIONS LLC D/B/A MULTIPLY.(Wesley, Keith) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |