Halvorson v. MNGI Digestive Health, P.A.
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Donovan W Frank |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02851 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 08, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 3:45 AM CDT |
Defendant
MNGI Digestive Health, P.A.
|
|
Plaintiff
Jason Halvorson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Fri 08/09 4:58 PM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 24-cv-3155 (PJS/DJF) has been reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 08/08/2024 and Chief Judge Patrick J. Schiltz on 08/09/2024.(LTT) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/08 3:24 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE re7 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank on 8/8/2024.(las) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/08 1:22 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason Halvorson (Goodwin, David) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 4:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Halvorson. MNGI Digestive Health, P.A. served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024. (Goodwin, David) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case
Wed 07/31 11:04 AM
ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT OF RELATED CASES that 24-cv-2874 (KMM/JFD), 24-cv-2893 (KMM/DTS), 24-cv-95 (JWB/DLM), 24-2971 (JRT/ECW) have been reassigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank and Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Signed by Judge Donovan W. Frank, Judge Katherine M. Menendez, Judge Jerry W. Blackwell, Judge John R. Tunheim on 7/30/2024.(MKB) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney
Mon 07/22 10:14 AM
(Text-Only) Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Marc H. Edelson as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:www.mnd.uscourts.gov/forms/all-forms] [LINK:. (MKB) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to MNGI Digestive Health, P.A. (MKB) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Mon 07/22 10:11 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-2851 (DWF/DJF). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) |
|
1 | 1
58
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 9:25 AM
COMPLAINT against MNGI Digestive Health, P.A. (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11206386) filed by Jason Halvorson. Filer requests summons issued. (Goodwin, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |