AbbVie Inc. et al v. Bailey et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen R Clark |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-00996 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Andrew Bailey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James L. Gray
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Colby Grove
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Darren Harris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas R. Lang
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anita K. Parran
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christian S. Tadrus
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tammy Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
AbbVie Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abbvie Products LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allergan, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Durata Therapeutics, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Pharmacyclics LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
4
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Wed 09/04 4:36 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re28 MOTION for Leave to File an Overlength Motion to Dismiss filed by Defendants Andrew Bailey, James L. Gray, Colby Grove, Darren Harris, Douglas R. Lang, Anita K. Parran, Christian S. Tadrus, Tammy Thompson. (Lanahan, Maria) |
|
28 | 28
motion
Leave to
Wed 09/04 4:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to File an Overlength Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Andrew Bailey, James L. Gray, Colby Grove, Darren Harris, Douglas R. Lang, Anita K. Parran, Christian S. Tadrus, Tammy Thompson. (Lanahan, Maria) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
order
A Docket Text Order with Schedules
Thu 08/01 10:34 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:26 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Andrew Bailey, James L. Gray, Colby Grove, Darren Harris, Douglas R. Lang, Anita K. Parran, Christian S. Tadrus, Tammy Thompson; ORDERED GRANTED. (All Defendants Answer due September 12, 2024). Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 8/1/2024. (LNJ) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 07/31 1:07 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Andrew Bailey, James L. Gray, Colby Grove, Darren Harris, Douglas R. Lang, Anita K. Parran, Christian S. Tadrus, Tammy Thompson. (Lanahan, Maria) |
|
25 | 25
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 07/31 1:01 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Maria Ann Lanahan for Defendants Andrew Bailey, James L. Gray, Colby Grove, Darren Harris, Douglas R. Lang, Anita K. Parran, Christian S. Tadrus, Tammy Thompson. (Lanahan, Maria) |
|
24 | 24
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 07/31 12:15 PM
Docket Text ORDER: The Court grants Matthew Owen's21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Meredith Pohl's22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and Michael Pronin's23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/31/24. (JAB) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 6:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael A. Pronin. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10739847) by Plaintiffs AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., Aptalis Pharma US, Inc., Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Pharmacyclics LLC.(Pronin, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing -DC for M. Pronin | ||
22 | 22
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 5:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Meredith Pohl. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10739804) by Plaintiffs AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., Aptalis Pharma US, Inc., Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Pharmacyclics LLC.(Pohl, Meredith) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing -DC for M. Pohl | ||
21 | 21
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/30 5:07 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Matthew S. Owen. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10739779) by Plaintiffs AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., Aptalis Pharma US, Inc., Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Pharmacyclics LLC.(Owen, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing -DC for Matt Owen | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Entry of Appearance
Mon 07/29 1:41 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Lisa A. Pake for Plaintiffs AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., Aptalis Pharma US, Inc., Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Pharmacyclics LLC. (Pake, Lisa) |
|
19 | 19
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 07/29 12:04 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan Holdings, Inc., Allergan Holdco US, Inc., AbbVie Inc. (Ultimate Parent), AbbVie Corporation, AbbVie S.A.S., AbbVie Services, Inc., Allergan Development Ventures I, L.P., Allergan Holdings B1, Inc., Allergan Holdings, Inc., MAP Pharmaceuticals, LLC.. (Haar, Robert) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 07/29 11:54 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Pharmacyclics LLC, AbbVie Inc... (Haar, Robert) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 07/29 11:50 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Aptalis Pharma US, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, AbbVie Inc. (Ultimate Parent).. (Haar, Robert) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 07/29 11:47 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Abbvie Products LLC, AbbVie Inc... (Haar, Robert) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 07/29 11:43 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan W.C. Holding Inc., AbbVie Inc. (Ultimate Parent).. (Haar, Robert) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 07/29 11:40 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Allergan, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, AbbVie Inc. (Ultimate Parent), AbbVie Healthcare India Private Limited, Abbvie Productos Farmaceuticos Limitada, AbbVie S.A., AbbVie S.A.S., Allergan Holdings, Inc., MAP Pharmaceuticals, LLC.. (Haar, Robert) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests)
Mon 07/29 11:31 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AbbVie Inc., AbbVie Corporation, AbbVie Farmaceuticos Sociedad Anonima de Capital Variable, AbbVie Group Holdings Limited, The Vanguard Group, Blackrock, Inc... (Haar, Robert) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:26 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. Darren Harris served on 7/23/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. Tammy Thompson served on 7/23/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. Colby Grove served on 7/23/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:19 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. Anita K. Parran served on 7/23/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. Douglas R. Lang served on 7/23/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:16 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. Christian S. Tadrus served on 7/23/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:14 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. James L. Gray served on 7/23/2024, answer due 8/13/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/25 3:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc.. Andrew Bailey served on 7/24/2024, answer due 8/14/2024. (Haar, Robert) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 07/23 10:48 AM
Docket Text ORDER: The Court orders the parties to review and comply with the undersigned's Judge's Requirements, located on the Eastern District of Missouri's court website:[LINK:Chief Judge Stephen R. Clark's Requirements] . The undersigned periodically updates his Judge's Requirements, and the parties must ensure that they are complying with the most recent version before filing any document. Failure to comply with the requirements may result in the imposition of "sanction[s] or other disadvantage." Fed. R. Civ. P. 83(b). Signed by Chief District Judge Stephen R. Clark on 7/23/2024. (LNJ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Notice of Process Server
Mon 07/22 10:10 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., Aptalis Pharma US, Inc., Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Pharmacyclics LLC Process Server: Rufus Harmon (Haar, Robert) |
|
2 | 2
service
Notice of Process Server
Mon 07/22 10:08 AM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., Aptalis Pharma US, Inc., Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Pharmacyclics LLC Process Server: Marybeth Rice (Haar, Robert) |
|
1 | 1
45
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 10:05 AM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against defendant Andrew Bailey, James L. Gray, Colby Grove, Darren Harris, Douglas R. Lang, Anita K. Parran, Christian S. Tadrus, Tammy Thompson with receipt number AMOEDC-10722815, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Pharmacyclics LLC, Durata Therapeutics, Inc., Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan, Inc., AbbVie Inc., Abbvie Products LLC, Aptalis Pharma US, Inc..(Haar, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons directed to Andrew Bailey, | ||
Att: 4 Summons directed to James L. Gray, | ||
Att: 5 Summons directed to Christian S. Tadrus, | ||
Att: 6 Summons directed to Douglas R. Lang, | ||
Att: 7 Summons directed to Anita K. Parran, | ||
Att: 8 Summons directed to Colby Grove, | ||
Att: 9 Summons directed to Tammy Thompson, | ||
Att: 10 Summons directed to Darren Harris | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 07/22 11:13 AM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Clark. 8 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Robert Haar. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JWD) |