Nesse v. Donegan et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:22-bk-11541
Lead BK case is: 0:22-bk-11541
Maryland Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Maria Ellena Chavez-Ruark |
Case #: | 0:24-ap-00187 |
Nature of Suit | 41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e) 11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 20, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
James Donegan, Debtor
16005 Daven Pine Court
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mirza J. Donegan
16005 Daven Pine Court
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Janet M. Nesse, Chapter 7 Trustee
6404 Ivy Lane Suite 820
Greenbelt, MD 20770 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 1:07 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Opposition
Thu 09/05 4:37 PM
Opposition on behalf of Janet M. Nesse Filed by Jeffrey M. Orenstein . (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 0 - Amended Schedules | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Schedules | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - Amended SOFA | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - IRS POC | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4 - Comptroller POC | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 4A - Comptroller Detail | ||
Att: 7 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 28, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Dismiss Count
Wed 08/28 4:14 PM
Motion to Dismiss Count V, VI, VII, and IX Filed by Mirza J. Donegan. (Lusby, Keith) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Saturday, August 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document (Auto-Docket)
Sun 08/25 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. . No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 08/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 08/22 8:12 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by James Donegan. (Coyle, Michael) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/22 8:06 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by James Donegan. (Coyle, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
order
Stipulation and Order
Thu 08/22 1:31 PM
Stipulation And Consent Order Extending Deadline To Respond To Complaint . Deadline to Respond to the Complaint is 8/28/2024. (Horning, Kelly) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing - AP (Auto-Docket)
Thu 07/25 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. . No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/24/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Affidavit of Summons Service
Tue 07/23 6:29 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on James Donegan 7/23/2024 . (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Affidavit of Summons Service
Tue 07/23 6:28 PM
Affidavit of Summons Service Executed on Mirza J. Donegan 7/23/2024 . (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 1:09 PM
Summons Issued on James Donegan Date Issued 7/22/2024, Answer Due 8/21/2024; Mirza J. Donegan Date Issued 7/22/2024, Answer Due 8/21/2024 . Pre-Trial Conference set for 9/25/2024 at 10:00 AM by videoconference or teleconference. For hearing access information see www.mdb.uscourts.gov/hearings or call 410-962-2688. (Horning, Kelly) |
|
Saturday, July 20, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Case Opening)
Sat 07/20 3:14 PM
Adversary case 24-00187 11 ,41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)),12,13,14) Complaint by Jeffrey M. Orenstein on behalf of Janet M. Nesse, Chapter 7 Trustee against James Donegan, Mirza J. Donegan. The filing fee is DEFERRED - Plaintiff is the Trustee in the Bankruptcy case and will pay the fee to the extent that there is an estate. (Orenstein, Jeffrey) |