ZEIDENFELD v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03226 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
JENNIFER STARR ZEIDENFELD
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/05 10:45 AM
NOTICE by JENNIFER STARR ZEIDENFELD (STEPHENSON, WAYNE) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 12:06 PM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. Forwarded To: counsel on 7/23/24. (mbh) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/23 9:44 AM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3226. (sbt) |
||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 07/23 10:31 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Form is missing (sbt) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
47
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/22 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17616764.), filed by JENNIFER STARR ZEIDENFELD.(STEPHENSON, WAYNE) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |