Bisagno v. Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Haywood S Gilliam, Jr |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04414 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Sonoma County Superior Court, 24CV01062 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 2:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Bisagno
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
respm
Opposition/Response to Motion
Wed 09/04 2:56 PM
OPPOSITION/RESPONSE filed byHome Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Okreglak, Marysia) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 | ||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Fri 08/30 1:48 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE DOCKET NO.14 . Notice is hereby given that counsel must re-notice not re-file the8 motion to remand. Hearing date of October 17, 2024, is vacated. The briefing schedule remains in effect. Counsel is directed to check the Court's scheduling notes before re-noticing the motion for a new hearing date. October 17, 2024 is listed as an unavailable date on the Judge's scheduling notes. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
14 | 14
oth_sup
Re-notice motion
Fri 08/30 9:56 AM
Renotice motion hearing Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion for an Order Remanding the Action to State Court filed byCharles Bisagno. (Moossai, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Tue 08/27 12:42 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE FOR REASSIGNED CIVIL CASE.Notice is hereby given that a Case Management Conference via a Zoom webinar has been set for November 5, 2024, before Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr., at 2:00 p.m. Case Management Statement due by October 29th. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. All future filings should reflect the case number as 4:24-cv-04414-HSG. All attorneys and pro se litigants appearing for the case management conference are required to join at least 15 minutes before the hearing to check-in with the CRD. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/hsg] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ndr, COURT STAFF) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/26 10:55 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to case. Signed by the Clerk on August 26, 2024. (kmm2, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment - Text Only
Fri 08/23 2:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/22 2:36 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc... (Tolson, Zachary) |
|
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 08/22 10:00 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff has filed a Motion to Remand8 and a hearing has been scheduled for 10/10/2024 01:00 PM. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 636, the magistrate judge cannot decide this motion unless all parties consent to proceed before Judge Donna M. Ryu.Plaintiff and Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 8/29/2024. (ig, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Remand
Wed 08/21 4:35 PM
MOTION to Remand filed by Charles Bisagno. Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2024 01:00 PM in Oakland, - Telephonic Only before Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Responses due by 9/4/2024. Replies due by 9/11/2024.(Moossai, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Moossai, Esq. in Support of Plaintiff Charles Bisagno's Motion for an Order Remanding The Action to State Court | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 08/12 1:10 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiffs/Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/26/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 07/24 3:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. re3 Certificate of Interested Entities,5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines,2 Certificate of Interested Entities,1 Notice of Removal, (Tolson, Zachary) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Wed 07/24 11:53 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/23/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/30/2024 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be held by Zoom. (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Mon 07/22 11:55 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/5/2024. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 07/22 11:50 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 07/22 11:45 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent The Home Depot, Inc. for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.. (Tolson, Zachary) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/22 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sonoma County Superior Court. Their case number is 24CV01062. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-19644328). Filed by Home Depot U.S.A., Inc..(Tolson, Zachary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |