Hill v. Online Information Systems
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nitza I Quinones Alejandr |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03228 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC
1550 PEACHTREE STREET NW
ATLANTA, GA 30309 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC.
475 Anton Boulevard
Costa Mesa, CA 96262 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRANSUNION, LLC
1510 Chester Pike
Crum Lynne, PA 19022 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ONLINE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Hill
501 Mattison Avenue Apt. 3007
Ambler, PA 19002 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Answer Deadline
Thu 09/05 11:52 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT ONLINE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 9/24/2024, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 9/4/24. 9/5/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/03 4:07 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney) for Extension to Respond to Complaint by ONLINE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC.. (Vugrinovich, Danielle) |
|
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/03 3:08 PM
Def. Trans Union, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint by TRANSUNION, LLC.(HOGAN, GRAEME) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/23 9:39 AM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION (DOC. NO.9 ) IS GRANTED AND DEFENDANTS TRANSUNION, LLC IS GRANTED AN EXTENSION OF TIME, UNTIL 9/3/2024, TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 8/22/24.8/23/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/22 3:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by AARON E. MOORE on behalf of ONLINE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. (MOORE, AARON) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/22 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Danielle M Vugrinovich on behalf of ONLINE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC. (Vugrinovich, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Wed 08/21 10:33 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Experian plc with certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) |
|
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/21 10:32 AM
ANSWER to Complaint together with affirmative defenses, certificate of service by EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC..(GHIASUDDIN, MOHAMMAD) |
|
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 2:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Khari Malik Griffin on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(Griffin, Khari) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 08/20 2:24 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(ORVETZ, STACY) |
|
11 | 11
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 08/20 2:23 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including Equifax, Inc. with Certificate of Service by EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC.(ORVETZ, STACY) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by STACY A. ORVETZ on behalf of EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC with Certificate of Service(ORVETZ, STACY) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/20 11:05 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by TRANSUNION, LLC.Certificate of Service.(HOPE, ANDREW) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1
Tue 08/20 11:02 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc. and TransUnion with Certificate of Service by TRANSUNION, LLC.(HOPE, ANDREW) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 08/12 2:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Wanda Jones re: served Complaint and Summons upon Online Information Systems, Inc. by Personal on August 12, 2024 (Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 08/05 8:54 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Bryce Keizer re: served Complaint and Summons upon Experian Information Solutions by Personal on July 31, 2024 (Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 07/31 3:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Herbert Giles re: served Complaint and Summons upon Equifax by Personal on July 30, 2024 (Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
4 | 4
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 07/31 9:42 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Joseph O'Donovan re: served Complaint and Summons upon Transunion by personal on July 30, 2024 (Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 8:52 AM
Summons Issued as to EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC., ONLINE INFORMATION SYSTEMS, INC., TRANSUNION, LLC. (amas) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 10:17 AM
NOTICE by Robert Hill Civil Cover Sheet(Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Designation Form | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 07/23 9:53 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. (sbt) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Mon 07/22 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS INC., EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES, LLC, TRANSUNION, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17617154.), filed by Robert Hill.(Ginsburg, Jacob) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A |