WebSock Global Strategies LLC v. Solace Corporation
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00567 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Aug 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 3:56 AM CDT |
Defendant
Solace Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
WebSock Global Strategies LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Thu 08/22 3:41 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (CH) |
|
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/22 3:40 PM
ORDER granting6 Stipulation of Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES that Plaintiffs claims against Defendant in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/22/2024. (CH) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/21 6:42 AM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal by WebSock Global Strategies LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 2:42 PM
SUMMONS Issued as to Solace Corporation. (NKL) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
Mon 07/22 2:37 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons
Mon 07/22 2:36 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by WebSock Global Strategies LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 07/22 2:34 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of WebSock Global Strategies LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
1 | 1
4
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Solace Corporation ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10251766.), filed by WebSock Global Strategies LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 07/22 2:38 PM
Case Assigned to District Judge Rodney Gilstrap. (NKL) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Mon 07/22 2:38 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (NKL) |