Speigner et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04057 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00839 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
974 Centre Road
Wilmington, DE 19805 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
1200 South Pine Island Road
Plantation, FL 33324 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WI Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Phil Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ramon Martinez
168455 Kirkland Reception and Evaluation Center 4344 Broad River Road
Columbia, SC 29210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven McCollum
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall McCoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward John McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chinua McGee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Douglas McGlothlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dorrell McKnight
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne McPhail
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Meadows
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Steven Medina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Joel Meester
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Mendes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John L Miceli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barry Blain Milam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Miller
144620 J Reuben Long Detention Center 4150 J Reuben Long Avenue
Conway, SC 29526 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Miller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Antoine Moaton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ellak Csaba Molnar, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lamont Moore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricardo Morales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Moreland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Keith Mosley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marjorie Moss
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan William Murray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Napier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Nixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Ivan Norgrove
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Owens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Pallitto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick E Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Peacock, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Damon Peck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wayne Penner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Perez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luke Pierce
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Pine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dewayne Pisciotta
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Terry Platts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Poe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Karrie Poling
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bonnie Polk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jon Pollard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Powell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clay Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Scott Provance
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wesley Puhl
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Quinn
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francis Radigan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Henry Rama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Rascoe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Reams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Reese
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scotty Reeves
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacquelyn Richardson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reginald Roberson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick F Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jr James E Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alejandro Romo
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ross
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenard Roton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathan Saenz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ivan Aispuro Sanchez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Luis Santiago
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cody Sargent
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Schossau
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denis Shea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robin Simpson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Single
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Skidmore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Alan Smiley, Sr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin Smith, Jr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Destin Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Smith
7911 E National Cemetery
Florence, SC 29501 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Herbert Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Snavely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael S Somogy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Soppe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Speigner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Stevens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Stowe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Shane Stringer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Swafford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Swett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel G Sydnor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lydel Tabada
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Talaske
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Henry Charles Tate
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwight Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Allen L Tennis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Terp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Tulumello
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Tunk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald F Van Winkle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sergio Vasquez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edgar Veale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Vicari
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Vollberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tommy Walker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johanna Waller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Justin Watson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Carnell Watson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Walter Weatherly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeff Weaver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Phillip Welton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert F Werneke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lori Wilkinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cpl Brandon Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clayton Williams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marlon Williams
Sheriff Al Cannon Det. Center 3841 Leeds Ave
N. Charleston, SC 29405 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nathaniel Williams
#56082-019 US Medical Center PO Box 4000
Springfield, MO 65801 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Wills
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua A Wisely
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Matthew Wolowic
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Wondolowski
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Wood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Wright
293265 Allendale Correctional Institution PO Box 1151
Fairfax, SC 29827 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Wyeth
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Yencer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/22 4:11 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 7/22/2024), 2:24-cv-00839, Speigner et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04057-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/22 4:09 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00839. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 10:07 AM
ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ORDER granting4 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants' answers are due 28 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation renders its final decision concerning transfer of this action to MDL No. 2873. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 6/27/2024. (CDG) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
4 | 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time 3M Company's Unopposed Initial Motion for Extension of Time Motion is RIPE 6/27/2024 . Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion. Filed by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE OF CONSENT to a magistrate judge in a civil action. (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-Cv-2024-902020.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Amended Complaint deemed filed in Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL on 5/20/2024 (AKD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4622614 (ALND receipt# B-12218). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Circuit Court of Jefferson County, AL, case number 01-Cv-2024-902020.00., filed by 3M Company.(AKD). (Radney, W) Modified on 6/27/2024 (AKD). [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] |