Colvin et al v. 3M Company, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04058 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 2:24-cv-00838 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills Inc
|
|
Defendant
Stedfast USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
WL Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group
|
|
Plaintiff
Broderick L Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jazemine Adams
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald T Aldrich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Allen
172646 Broad River Correctional Institution 4460 Broad River Road
Columbia, SC 29210 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Anderson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven L Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Austin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin W Babb
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timmy Wayne Barr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edzel Peter Barrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Reynolds Beardsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roland Henry Berger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Best
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy Black
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt C Boerner
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Delbert Ray Bosley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Aliciarae Boucher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Bowron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Brannon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Briggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Kenneth Brooker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Andrew Brothers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christel Michelle Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Bryant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Everett Burns
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Carr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
III Norman Carter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Chrusniak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Eugene Civers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Clark
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derek Clarke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Benjamin A Clason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John T Colton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Colvin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Comfort
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald E Cook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Copeland
172920 Lee Correctional Institution 990 Wisacky Highway
Bishopville, SC 29010 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Joseph Courcelle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eric Cowart
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teddy R Crawford
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jose Crego
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Cronk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Lee Dandridge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carol Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rodney Neil Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Shay Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Allen Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Delaney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Delao
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Demchak
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Philip Digennaro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shaun Dixon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steve Dubosky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marco D Duenas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Echols
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Elliott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ben B Ellorin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Erickson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alan Fabry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fansler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffery Fein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan A Feliciano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Fiegel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Fifer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Fletcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracey Folds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert A Fontana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Fred Fowle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wade Frauen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Nicholas Frazier
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Ganning
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Troy George
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. William Gibson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dean Giles
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marion Gleason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Gockley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Scott Goodrich
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Graham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Allen Grant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Gray
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy M Grigalanz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesse Grimes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Groody, III
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Guevara
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Hamlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Hammond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Hansen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Harbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rich Harms
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gloria Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edward Hatch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clay S Hedricks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheryl Henry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dallas Aldene Herring, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Hill
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Hollie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheryl Holloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Hollyday
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Holshouser
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Horton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harold Hosmon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Allen Hudnall
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeffrey Allan Hunter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Hurst
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Jackson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wiley James
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Jarveis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph F Kaye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Keller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Billy Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Morgan Kemp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrick Glenn Kenebrew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Klinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN LEWIS
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Eric La Londe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doug Gordon Leclair
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ignatius Lehew
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Lindsley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shawn Logan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ernesto Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valerie J Maggard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Johnnie Marshall
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kenneth Charles Shaw Et al., Edwin Gomez, Sr, Ronald Spontak Et al., Brian James Rizner Et al., Terri Smith, Robert Turley, Christopher Burris Et al., John Dunn, Kathy Battle, David C Bolt, Paul A Brady, Raegan Dowdell, Tommie Reese, Sharon Sizer, Joseph Michauskas Et al., Gary Hanna Et al., John Belton Et al., Craig Tully, Abel Perez, Allen Kairis, Andrew Plumlee, RUSSELL LEE LORD, Teresa Harrell, Nina Jones, John Perez, Benjamin Smith, Jr, Dwight Taylor, Steve Dubosky, Larry Beemer Et al., Keith Alan Bluestein, James Ouzts Et al. Carl Sarvey as to Hanna, et al; Robert Raymond Bonomini as to Shaw, et al; Ellis Nakamura as to Shaw, et al; Melvin Alex Garcia as to Beemer, et al; Kevin Hinzo as to Burris, et al; Randall Jones, Jr., as to Ouzts, et al; Alonzo E. Lagle as to Ouzts, et al; Mitchell Feller as to Belton, et al; Robert C. Powell, Sr. as to Rizner, et al; Joey Rios, III as to Rizner, et al; Chris Ban Noy as to Spontak, et al; Will A. Peden, Jr. as to Spontak, et al; James Desmond Bocek as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Eric Cordy as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 8:47 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Christopher Cannes, Joseph Michauskas Et al., RUSSELL LEE LORD, Dennis Edward Holladay, Steven Gockley, Charles Foster Dwayne Trennell Byous as to Michauskas, et al; Thomas Carlisle as to Michauskas, et a; Joe Roger Carlomagno as to Michauskas, et al; David Carlton as to Michauskas, et al; Carlos Castaneda as to Michauskas, et al; Charles Chaffee as to Michauskas, et al; Raymond Chenevert as to Michauskas, et al; Robert Christiansen as to Michauskas, et al; Michael Churchill as to Michauskas, et al; James Todd Conn as to Michauskas, et al; James Robert Cook as to Michauskas, et al; Phillip Cooper as to Michauskas, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/16 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Roy Prince, Aaron Philip Warnick, William Carlson, Stephen Chick, Michael A Diotte, Jerel Butler, George Culbreth, David Curtis Gorman, Joshua Hamman, Christopher Hulliger, John Belton Et al., Kelly A Martinez, Shanneal Ocular, Richard J. Timmerman, Michelle West, Amanda Young, Shyla Johnson, Vernon Johnson, Christopher Kirschke, April Bijak, Jazemine Adams, Shanti Koko, Ray Leete, Shallen Yazett McKiness, Felix Lang Auguster, Robert Becker, Darryl C Hair, Joseph Heinley, Michael Humphrey, Donald Martin, Richard Parler, Kenneth R Plain, Tracy Dewayne Richards, Daniel W Wilborn, III, Larkin Batten, Jr, Nathaniel Brazell, Glenn Brian, James H Roberts, Dennis Shock Ronald Gayle as to Belton, et al; Lennox Garvin Glft as to Belton, et al; Roy Gilbert as to Belton, et al; Jeffery Milton Gissendanner as to Belton, et al; Everett Grant as to Belton, et al; Jerome James Grasso as to Belton, et al; Donald David Gray as to Belton, et al; Clayton Allen Hall as to Belton, et al; Martin Hall as to Belton, et al; David Allan Hamman as to Belton, et al; James Hanlon as to Belton, et al; WITHOUT PREJUDICEAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Anderson, Gary) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Member Cases | ||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/22 4:16 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Alabama Northern (associated as of 7/19/2024), 2:24-cv-00838, Colvin et al v. 3M Company, et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04058-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
7 | 7
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/22 4:14 PM
Case transferred in from District of Alabama Northern; Case Number 2:24-cv-00838. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Order
Mon 07/22 10:05 AM
ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of South Carolina for inclusion in MDL 2873; record electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of South Carolina. (KAM) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 TEXT ORDER : Defendant 3M Company's "Unopposed Initial Motion For Extension Of Time" (Doc.4 ) is GRANTED . All Defendants' responsive pleadings now are due on or before the 28th day after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation declines to transfer this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 06/28/2024. (CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Thursday, June 27, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time 3M Company's Unopposed Initial Motion for Extension of Time by 3M Company. (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE FOR TRIAL (CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Wednesday, June 26, 2024 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by 3M Company (CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2024-902018., filed by 3M Company.(CLD) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 405, receipt_number AALNDC-4622713(ALND B-12219). related document1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 3M Company from Jefferson County Circuit Court, case number 01-CV-2024-902018., filed by 3M Company.(CLD). (Radney, W) [Transferred from Alabama Northern on 7/22/2024.] |