USA v. Currency
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | David C Joseph |
Referred: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00977 |
Nature of Suit | 625 Forfeiture/Penalty - Drug Related Seizure of Property 21 USC 881 |
Cause | 21:841 Forfeiture Property-Drugs |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 3:41 AM CDT |
Defendant
Currency
|
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Warrant Returned
Mon 07/29 2:42 PM
WARRANT Returned Executed as to Sivi Medina, United States Marshal Service, Eastern District of Louisiana thru electronic notification. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Affidavit
Tue 07/23 10:06 AM
AFFIDAVIT re1 Complaint Agent Verification by USA. (aty,Edwards, Jabrina) |
|
2 | 2
order
Warrant Issued
Tue 07/23 9:13 AM
WARRANT for Arrest of Property In Rem issued. (crt,Bunting, M) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 4:53 PM
COMPLAINT against Currency filed by USA.(Attorney Jabrina Clayton Edwards added to party USA(pty:pla))(aty,Edwards, Jabrina) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Warrant, | ||
Att: 2 Civil cover sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/23 9:04 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge David C Joseph and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Bunting, M) |