Sinkfield-Morey v. Minnesota Life Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | John R Tunheim |
Referred: | Tony N Leung |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02875 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 3:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Minnesota Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrice Sinkfield-Morey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order/Notice to Attorney
Wed 08/14 1:50 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER: Due to the pending Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings11 , the Court finds there is good cause to delay the entry of a pretrial scheduling order. Within 30 days of the motion being decided, the parties shall contact the chambers of Magistrate Judge Tony Leung, by e-mail, for the purpose of scheduling the pretrial conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 8/14/2024. (HAM) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Tue 08/13 1:30 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Hamilton Cawley, Molly) |
|
13 | 13
6
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 08/13 1:29 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company.(Hamilton Cawley, Molly) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 08/13 1:28 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION11 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings : Date and time to be determined. (Hamilton Cawley, Molly) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Tue 08/13 1:26 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Hamilton Cawley, Molly) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
discov
Rule 7.1 - Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/12 4:59 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Hamilton Cawley, Molly) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/12 4:54 PM
Defendants ANSWER to Complaint filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (Hamilton Cawley, Molly) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Affidavit of Service
Wed 07/31 4:48 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Patrice Sinkfield-Morey re1 Complaint (Lindell, James) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Exhibit/Exhibit List (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Wed 07/31 12:31 PM
EXHIBIT Exhibit 1- AD&D Policy re1 Complaint filed by Patrice Sinkfield-Morey.(Lindell, James) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2- Denial Letter of 4.11.23 | ||
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Affidavit of Service
Mon 07/29 1:11 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by Patrice Sinkfield-Morey (Lindell, James) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 10:28 AM
Summons Issued as to Minnesota Life Insurance Company. (CLK) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 07/23 10:27 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 24-cv-2875 JRT/TNL. Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (CLK) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 10:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James E Lindell on behalf of Patrice Sinkfield-Morey. (Lindell, James) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/22 5:08 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET re1 Complaint filed by Minnesota Life Insurance Company Employee Benefit Plan filed by Patrice Sinkfield-Morey. (Lindell, James) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Minnesota Life Insurance Company Employee Benefit Plan (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11209566) filed by Patrice Sinkfield-Morey. Filer requests summons issued. (Lindell, James) |