Landau v. Cratera Technology, LLC
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Referred: | Alistair Newbern |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00051 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:501 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Cratera Technology, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Landau
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 08/07 2:54 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint. Cratera Technology, LLC answer due 9/21/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern on 8/7/2024. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/07 10:12 AM
SUMMONS returned executed by Robert Landau. Cratera Technology, LLC served on 7/31/2024. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/06 1:02 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint by Cratera Technology, LLC. (Bradford, Michael) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Tue 08/06 12:35 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 83.01(D) by Robert Landau. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Case Management Conference
Mon 07/22 4:58 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 9/24/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Alistair Newbern. (sb) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Mon 07/22 4:55 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement
Mon 07/22 4:55 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Mon 07/22 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 07/22 4:54 PM
Summons issued as to Cratera Technology, LLC. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons. (sb) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Business Entity Disclosure Statement
Mon 07/22 4:48 PM
BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Robert Landau. (sb) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 4:46 PM
COMPLAINT against Cratera Technology, LLC (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4124741), filed by Robert Landau.(sb) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Original Photographs, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Infringing Uses of Photographs, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Report On The Filing Of An Action Regarding A Copyright, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Annotation - Bar Status
Mon 07/22 5:01 PM
NY State Bar status verified as active for Craig B. Sanders admitted to this court - Local counsel required . (sb) |