Lyons v. DM Express et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Waverly D Crenshaw, Jr |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00884 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:09 AM CDT |
Defendant
DM Express
|
|
Defendant
Ron Pavolich
|
|
Defendant
Starline Transport
|
|
Defendant
Zephyr Expediting
|
|
Defendant
DM MTI/Express
|
|
Plaintiff
Maryland E. Lyons
253 Mountain High Drive
Antioch, TN 37013 |
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Supplement
Thu 07/25 11:57 AM
SUPPLEMENT filed by Maryland E. Lyons re1 Complaint. (am) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Mon 07/22 5:35 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Mon 07/22 5:35 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 07/22 5:34 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Maryland E. Lyons. (mg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 5:30 PM
COMPLAINT against DM Express, Ron Pavolich, Starline Transport, Zephyr Expediting, filed by Maryland E. Lyons: #1 Attachment - Letter dated October 19, 2023) (mg). Modified on 7/22/2024 (mg) |
|
misc
Annotation - Docket
Mon 07/22 5:37 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included.) (mg) |