Jahanikia v. Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sallie Kim |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04421 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Case in other court: | San Francisco Superior Court, CGC-24-614053 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 2:51 AM PDT |
Defendant
Porsche Cars North America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sahar Jahanikia
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
adr
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options
Thu 09/05 5:31 PM
ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Sogoyan, Gregory) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Thu 08/29 9:48 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Porsche Cars North America, Inc... (Knighton, Adam) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Fri 08/23 9:23 AM
CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION: Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/6/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 08/07 11:15 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT OR DECLINATION: Defendant Porsche Cars North America, Inc. shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/21/2024 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/06 10:13 AM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Sahar Jahanikia.. (Jacobson, Kevin) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal)
Mon 07/29 2:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. (Knighton, Adam) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Tue 07/23 12:27 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/14/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/21/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 07/23 11:12 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Volkswagen AG, Corporate Parent Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG, Corporate Parent Porsche Enterprises Incorporated, Corporate Parent Porsche Nordamerika Holding GmbH, Corporate Parent PPF Holding AG, Corporate Parent Porsche Holding Stuttgart GmbH for Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. re1 Notice of Removal, (Knighton, Adam) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 07/23 10:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Porsche Enterprises Incorporated for Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. re1 Notice of Removal, (Knighton, Adam) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/23 9:20 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/6/2024. (kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 07/23 8:22 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer did not add all interested parties when prompted. Re-file this document in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents. Please re-file in its entirety Re:2 Certificate of Interested Entities filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Mon 07/22 4:22 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Porsche Cars North America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Porsche Enterprises Incorporated for Porsche Cars North America, Inc.. re1 Notice of Removal, (Knighton, Adam) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Mon 07/22 4:19 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco County Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-24-614053. (Filing fee $405 receipt number BCANDC-19646528). Filed by Porsche Cars North America, Inc..(Knighton, Adam) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Contract, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet |