Bolinger v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04423 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 2:52 AM PDT |
Defendant
Facebook Operations, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Facebook Payments, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Instagram, LLC
1601 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 |
|
Defendant
Meta Platforms, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Siculus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Snap Inc.
3000 31st Street
Santa Monica, CA 90405 |
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Bolinger
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 12:28 PM
Summons Issued as to Facebook Operations, LLC, Facebook Payments, Inc., Instagram, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc., Siculus, Inc., Snap Inc.. (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/23 8:15 AM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/24 12:04 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 3047: Bolinger v. Meta Platforms, Inc. et al. Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-04423-YGR. cc: JPMDL (dhm, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons
Mon 07/22 4:48 PM
Proposed Summons.(Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Supplement Attachment to Summons | ||
1 | 1
10
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT MASTER SHORT-FORM COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19646720.). Filed by Cynthia Bolinger.(Marquez-Garrett, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |