California Central District Court
Judge:Monica Ramirez Almadani
Referred: Brianna Fuller Mircheff
Case #: 2:24-cv-06144
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Jul 22, 2024
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 1:02 AM PST
Defendant
Goldco Direct LLC
Represented By
John W. McGuinness
Manatt Phelps And Phillips LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Beth Sarver Ashworth
Represented By
Jonathan Gil
Kazerouni Law Group, Apc
contact info
Ryan Lee McBride
Kazerouni Law Group, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Thu 09/19 4:59 PM
ORDER STAYING ACTION PENDING FINAL SETTLEMENT AND FILING OF DISMISSAL, REMOVING CASE FROM ACTIVE CASELOAD13 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. The parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal within 60 days (the "Dismissal Date") of this order. If no dismissal is filed, the Court deems the matter dismissed at that time. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/16 12:08 PM
Notice of Resolution filed by Plaintiff Beth Sarver Ashworth. (McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
12 12 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Wed 09/11 1:42 PM
ORDER GRANTING SECOND STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT granting Stipulation11 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the MOTION IS GRANTED AND APPROVED, and Defendant Goldco Direct LLC shall have until and including September 27, 2024, to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Dkt. 1). (bm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
11 11 stip Extending Time to Answer (More than 30 days) Tue 09/10 4:09 PM
Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 9/27/2024 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Goldco Direct LLC.(McGuinness, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, August 12, 2024
10 10 order Extending Answer Due Deadline Mon 08/12 9:35 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT BY NOT MORE THAN 30 DAYS(L.R. 8-3)9 by Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Goldco Direct LLC shall have to and including September 13, 2024 to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (lom)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
9 9 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Fri 08/09 3:27 PM
First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Goldco Direct LLC answer now due 9/13/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Goldco Direct LLC.(Attorney John W. McGuinness added to party Goldco Direct LLC(pty:dft))(McGuinness, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Approving Stipulation and Joint Motion To Extend Time To Respond To Complaint By Not More Than 30 Days
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 07/23 11:16 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Goldco Direct LLC. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 07/23 11:12 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 07/23 11:12 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 07/23 11:11 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Monica Ramirez Almadani and Magistrate Judge Brianna Fuller Mircheff. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
4 4 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/22 5:02 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Beth Sarver Ashworth, (McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 07/22 4:59 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Beth Sarver Ashworth. (McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 07/22 4:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Beth Sarver Ashworth. (McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/22 4:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37877899 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Beth Sarver Ashworth. (Attorney Ryan Lee McBride added to party Beth Sarver Ashworth(pty:pla))(McBride, Ryan)
Related: [-]