SPINS LLC et al v. Bedrock Analytics LLC
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:24-mc-80183 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, September 02, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
order
Discovery Order
Mon 09/02 10:28 PM
Order Granting Motion to Compel. (Beeler, Laurel) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
minutes
Motion Hearing 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Thu 08/29 1:57 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler: Motion Hearing held via hybrid hearing on 8/29/2024. Matters are argued and submitted. The court authorizes discovery. Order to follow. Total Time in Court: 20 minutes. Digital Recording Time: 1:28 - 1:48. Plaintiff's Attorneys: Matthew John O'Hara and Meghan E Tepas (by Zoom). Defendant's Attorney: Chris Edgar (by Zoom). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/29/2024) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Response ( Non Motion )
Mon 08/12 3:37 PM
RESPONSE re1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening),, Petitioners' Reply In Support of Their Motion to Compel Compliance with Subpoena by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC. (Edwards, Anne) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 08/07 12:22 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bedrock Analytics LLC.. (Frimel, William) |
|
21 | 21
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Wed 08/07 10:58 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE TO RESPONDENT Re: Consent or Declination. The respondent shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 8/14/2024. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shy, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 08/06 7:42 AM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Bedrock Analytics LLC (Frimel, William) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Mon 08/05 4:46 PM
Declaration in Support of17 Response to Motion to Compel filed byBedrock Analytics LLC. (Frimel, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of William J. Frimel | ||
18 | 18
oth_sup
Declaration in Support
Mon 08/05 4:45 PM
Declaration in Support of17 Response to Motion to Compel filed byBedrock Analytics LLC. (Frimel, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Declaration of William Salcido, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B to Declaration of William Salcido, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C to Declaration of William Salcido, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D to Declaration of William Salcido, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E to Declaration of William Salcido, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F to Declaration of William Salcido, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G to Declaration of William Salcido | ||
17 | 17
respoth
Response
Mon 08/05 4:40 PM
Response re1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening),, by Bedrock Analytics LLC. (Frimel, William) |
|
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 08/01 12:32 PM
NOTICE by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC Notice of Hybrid Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance of Subpoena Issued to Bedrock Analytics LLC (Edwards, Anne) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom
Wed 07/31 3:21 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING HYBRID HEARING: Motion Hearing1 Motion to Compel set for 8/29/2024 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. This proceeding will be held via a hybrid hearing. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/lb] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Wed 07/24 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC re9 Notice (Other) Notice of Hearing on Motion to Compel (Edwards, Anne) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/24 1:56 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC.. (Edwards, Anne) |
|
12 | 12
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 11:49 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 11:35 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice For Meghan Tepas ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19653486.) filed by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC. (Tepas, Meghan) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 07/24 11:30 AM
NOTICE by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC Notice re Consent or Declination to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Edwards, Anne) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 07/24 1:40 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety, using event: Certificate/Proof of Service.*** Re:8 Notice (Other) filed by Wellness Acquisition Co., Inc., DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 1:38 PM
NOTICE by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC re1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening),, Notice of Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance of Subpoena Issued to Bedrock Analytics LLC (Edwards, Anne) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 1:29 PM
NOTICE by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC re1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening),, Notice of Hearing on Motion to Compel Compliance of Subpoena Issed to Bedrock Analytics LLC (Edwards, Anne) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Tue 07/23 11:17 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC identifying Corporate Parent SPINS LLC for DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC. re1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening),, Defendants SPINS LLC and DAAP LLC Certification of Interested Entities or Persons (Edwards, Anne) |
|
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 07/23 9:57 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING MOTION HEARING: Motion Hearing1 Motion to Compel set for 8/29/2024 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. Responses due by 8/5/2024. Replies due by 8/12/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) , Set/Reset Deadlines as to (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Tue 07/23 9:54 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 7/30/2024 . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/23 9:53 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler granting 3 Motion for Pro Hac Vice. (ejk, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Pro Hac Vice
Tue 07/23 9:46 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19647959.) filed by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC. (O'Hara, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Miscellaneous Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/23 8:12 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Laurel Beeler. (smc, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 07/23 10:26 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . ***The Certificate of Interested Entities should be e-filed separately and not as part of, or as an attachment to, the Complaint/Motion or other initiating documents. Please re-file the Certification in its entirety and when prompted, enter all affiliates or corporate parents.*** Re:1 Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening), filed by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC (krp, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Motion to Compel (Miscellaneous Case Opening)
Mon 07/22 5:47 PM
MOTION TO COMPEL Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Compliance of Subpoena Issued to Bedrock Analytics LLC; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Supporting Declarations of Meghan E. Tapas and John Pavlenkof against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 52, receipt number ACANDC-19646930.). Filed by DAAP LLC, SPINS LLC.(Edwards, Anne) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Defendants SPINS LLC and DAAP LLC Certification of Interested Entities or Persons |