Herrera v. Another Ride Inc. et al
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie Abrams |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-05539 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e-2sx Job Discrimination (Sex) |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Last checked: Thursday Sep 05, 2024 4:58 AM EDT |
Defendant
Another Ride Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Jennifer Ayala
|
|
Defendant
Anthony Doe
|
|
Defendant
Don Thomas Buses Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Liz Gamba
|
|
Plaintiff
Ivelisse Herrera
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/03 5:56 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Liz Gamba served on 8/28/2024, answer due 9/18/2024. Service was accepted by Daniella D.a person of suitable age and discretion. Said premises is the defendant's/respondent's actual place of business within the state. She identified herself as the CO-WORKER of the defendant/respondent.. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
15 | 15
service
Summons Returned Executed
Tue 09/03 5:55 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Jennifer Ayala served on 8/28/2024, answer due 9/18/2024. Service was accepted by Daniella D.a person of suitable age and discretion. Said premises is the defendant's/respondent's actual place of business within the state. She identified herself as the CO-WORKER of the defendant/respondent.. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/31 6:00 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Don Thomas Buses Inc. served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/31 5:59 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Another Ride Inc. served on 7/29/2024, answer due 8/19/2024. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, authorized agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Request for Issuance of Summons
Wed 07/24 3:31 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Catalina Sojo to RE-FILE Document No. 12 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The Request for Issuance of Summons cannot be issued for the party requested because it does not identify the party subject to service. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(A) and FRCP Rule 4(a)(1)(B): a summons must name the parties and be directed to the defendant. Once the party has been identified, the filing party may request a summons at that time. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 07/23 3:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Doe, re:11 Complaint. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
11 | 11
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 3:10 PM
COMPLAINT against Another Ride Inc., Jennifer Ayala, Anthony Doe, Don Thomas Buses Inc., Liz Gamba. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 1:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Liz Gamba..(pc) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 1:38 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jennifer Ayala..(pc) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 1:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Another Ride Inc...(pc) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 1:37 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Don Thomas Buses Inc...(pc) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Tue 07/23 11:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Tue 07/23 11:19 AM
Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Tue 07/23 11:19 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 07/23 11:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Catalina Sojo to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/22 6:25 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Liz Gamba, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
5 | 5
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/22 6:24 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jennifer Ayala, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/22 6:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Don Thomas Buses Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Mon 07/22 6:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Another Ride Inc. (D/B/A Don Thomas Buses Inc.), re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 07/22 6:20 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sojo, Catalina) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/22 6:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Another Ride Inc., Jennifer Ayala, Anthony Doe, Don Thomas Buses Inc., Liz Gamba. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29639098)Document filed by Ivelisse Herrera..(Sojo, Catalina) |