Alexander et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03941 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-04068 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
John Fox
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Dyson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bryan Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Hakimeh Ebrahimi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Edwards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Elhorre
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Greg Eneix
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wesley Engrecht
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Falkenberg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Finnie
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Fiore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shirley Floyd
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stuart Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Franks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Frye
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DAVID GUTIERREZ
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Emilio Gamez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Garrett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Darrell Gaul
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clim Gilliam
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Gordon
2210 DeKalb School Road
Camden, SC 29820 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ricky Grider
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Gulla
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elissa Biller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Willie Burchette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angee Butcher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Cama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Canales
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mickey Brock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vic Brittain
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Bostwick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Chlad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Blair
P.O. Box 53
Georgetown, SC 29576 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Conrad
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cyprus Content
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Danny Coronado
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Keith Aytay
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ranzi Cowan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandie Crow
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paula Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandi Delk
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laverne Bellephant
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Downey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miles Druebert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Duncan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathy Bauck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patricia Durham
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/22 12:40 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 7/12/2024), 1:24-cv-04068, Alexander et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03941-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/22 12:30 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-04068. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/21/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John P. Cronan. Judge Analisa Torres is no longer assigned to the case. (laq) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on All Parties on 05/28/2024. Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company)..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152313/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29407200).Document filed by Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually), Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company)..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY State Court Complaint |