Harney et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03943 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2024 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:24-cv-04074 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 27, 2024 6:08 AM EDT |
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E. I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Miguel Vazquez Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nicholas Zanella
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Mauller
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kathryn Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronda Mandel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonardo Mangiaracina-Martinez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chariti Messer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Morelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Roy Lyle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlie Owens
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dennis Parker
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Adrianne Patterson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelly Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Reynolds
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cynthia Rule
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vermell Salmond
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Geri Scroggins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patra Sweeting
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Connie Wilson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debbie Worley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bill Yameen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Gerry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Blake
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loreal Bouchee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Caley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Caouette
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Carpenter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daniel Carr
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Clesceri
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Cordle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Crites
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gayle Dettmar
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rebecca Dowdy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glen Frausto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Freel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gregory Lorence
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Staffordphyllis Graybeal
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
April Gutknecht
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Selby Harney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Rhonda Harrelson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cheryl Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Heidbrider, Sr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jody Huffman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Huscher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Johnson
2031 Leesburg Road
Columbia, SC 29209 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Albert Katanov
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Koppa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Licker
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/03 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lanaye Peeples, Ruben Perez, Eric Perkins, David Pittman, Arthur Scott Fitton, Lawrence Esposito, Todd Fingerle, Juan Aleman II, Jack Carter, Joseph Anthony, Jacqueline Dugan, Christina Hall, John Bertrand, Mary Bingeman, Elijah Meredith, Ronda Mandel, Raymond Plunk, Lewis Scott Raines, Alan Foringer, Frank Brendle NOTICE OF DISMISSAL BY LISTED PLAINTIFFS ONLY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 41(a)(1)(A)(i) & SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/22 1:14 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 7/12/2024), 1:24-cv-04074, Harney et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03943-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/22 1:05 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:24-cv-04074. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Friday, June 21, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 6/21/2024) (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina.(vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Wednesday, May 29, 2024 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (vf) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
3 | 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal and Civil Cover Sheet served on All Parties on 05/28/2024. Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually)..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 152343/2024. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29408455).Document filed by Chemguard Inc., Tyco Fire Products, LP(as successor in interest to The Ansul Company), Tyco Fire Products, LP(individually)..(Herten, Thomas) [Transferred from New York Southern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - NY State Court Complaint |