Spreitzer et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04011 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1442 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-05512 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 6:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Narcote LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
doing business as Southern Mills Inc.; 6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Steven Spreitzer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmelita Earls
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Gulliford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 08/19 10:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Steven Spreitzer on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Allstar Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant Amerex Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service on defendant Archroma U.S., Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service on defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service on defendant Carrier Global Corporation, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service on defendant CB Garment, Inc., d/b/a Crewboss, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemguard, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Certificate of Service on defendant Clariant Corporation, | ||
Att: 11 Certificate of Service on defendant Corveta, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service on defendant Daikin America, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Certificate of Service on defendant Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Certificate of Service on defendant Dynax Corporation, | ||
Att: 15 Certificate of Service on defendant E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 16 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc., | ||
Att: 17 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire-Dex, LLC, | ||
Att: 18 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 19 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 20 Certificate of Service on defendant Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Certificate of Service on defendant Innotex Corporation, | ||
Att: 22 Certificate of Service on defendant Johnson Controls, Inc., | ||
Att: 23 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., (f/k/a Chubb National Foam, Inc., f/k/a National Foam, Inc.), | ||
Att: 24 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., (f/k/a Fenwal, Inc), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc., | ||
Att: 26 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Apparel, Inc., | ||
Att: 27 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Group, Inc., | ||
Att: 28 Certificate of Service on defendant L.N. Curtis & Sons, | ||
Att: 29 Certificate of Service on defendant Mallory Safety and Supply, LLC, | ||
Att: 30 Certificate of Service on defendant Milliken & Company, | ||
Att: 31 Certificate of Service on defendant Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, | ||
Att: 32 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated, | ||
Att: 33 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Sales, LLC, | ||
Att: 34 Certificate of Service on defendant Municipal Emergency Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 35 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote Holding Corporation (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 36 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote, LLC (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 37 Certificate of Service on defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company, | ||
Att: 38 Certificate of Service on defendant National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 39 Certificate of Service on defendant PBI Performance Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 40 Certificate of Service on defendant Perimeter Solutions, LP, | ||
Att: 41 Certificate of Service on defendant Ricochet Manufacturing Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 42 Certificate of Service on defendant Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc., | ||
Att: 43 Certificate of Service on defendant Stedfast USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 44 Certificate of Service on defendant Tencate Protective Fabrics USA, d/b/a Southern Mills, Inc., | ||
Att: 45 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 46 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 47 Certificate of Service on defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. as Successor-In-Interest to The Ansul Company, | ||
Att: 48 Certificate of Service on defendant United Technologies Corporation, | ||
Att: 49 Certificate of Service on defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (f/k/a GE Interlogix, Inc.), Individually as as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 50 Certificate of Service on defendant Veridian Limited d/b/a Veridian Fire Protective Gear, | ||
Att: 51 Certificate of Service on defendant Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc., d/b/a "The Fire Store", | ||
Att: 52 Certificate of Service on defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc., | ||
Att: 53 Certificate of Service on defendant Arkema, Inc., | ||
Att: 54 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemdesign Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 55 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde PLC, Inc., (f/k/a Williams US Inc., f/k/a Williams Holdins, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc. | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 4:05 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/22 3:02 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern Illinois (associated as of 7/18/2024), 1:24-cv-05512, Spreitzer et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04011-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/22 3:01 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-05512. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 TRANSFERRED to the District of South Carolina the electronic record. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 07/18/2024 **Civil Case Terminated. (daj, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
8 | 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Carmelita Earls, Mark Gulliford, Steven Spreitzer by Mitchell Wald Bild (Bild, Mitchell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Carmelita Earls, Mark Gulliford, Steven Spreitzer by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
6 | 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Carmelita Earls, Mark Gulliford, Steven Spreitzer by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
5 | 5 MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani: An initial status hearing is set for 8/6/2024 at 9:15 a.m. by telephone. By 7/30/2024, the parties shall file a joint initial status report. A template for the Joint Initial Status Report can be found on the Court's web page. If the defendant(s) have not been served by the initial status date, counsel for plaintiff is to contact the Courtroom Deputy to reschedule the status hearing and the date for filing an initial status report. In some cases, the scheduled initial status hearing may take place before a defendant has responded to the plaintiff's complaint. The Court expects all defendants who have been served with process to participate in the scheduling conference even if they have not yet responded to the complaint. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing but will be placed on mute. The call-in number is (855) 244-8681 and the access code is 172 628 1276##. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Mailed notice (lxs, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Heather K. McShain. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Saturday, June 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court, case number (2024L005870) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22196252.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |