Smith et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04015 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1446 Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Illinois Northern, 1:24-cv-05514 |
Last checked: Sunday Sep 01, 2024 6:14 AM EDT |
Defendant
National Foam. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis & Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Apparel Inc
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
MSA Safety Sales LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services Inc
|
|
Defendant
Narcote Holding Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Narcote LLC
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Lakeland Industries Inc
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Co Inc
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies Inc
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
TenCate Protective Fabrics USA
6501Mall Blvd.
Union City, GA 30291 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products L.P.
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group Inc
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment CO
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
E.I. du Pont de Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde Fire Fighting Inc
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Globe Holding Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex LLC
780 Progress Dr.
Medina, OH 44256 |
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Platt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Maloney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dwayne Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sandra Smith
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Carmel Maloney
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Catherine Platt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Gleason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Marie Gleason
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Fancher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caryl Fancher
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Denise Noonan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Noonan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 11:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 6:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, Globe Manufacturing Co LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
service
Certificate of Service
Fri 08/16 3:38 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dwayne Smith on all defendants(Lumb, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service on defendant AGC Chemicals Americas, Inc., | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Service on defendant Allstar Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 3 Certificate of Service on defendant Amerex Corporation, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service on defendant Archroma U.S., Inc., | ||
Att: 5 Certificate of Service on defendant Buckeye Fire Equipment Co., | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service on defendant Carrier Global Corporation, | ||
Att: 7 Certificate of Service on defendant CB Garment, Inc., d/b/a Crewboss, | ||
Att: 8 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemguard, Inc., | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 10 Certificate of Service on defendant Clariant Corporation, | ||
Att: 11 Certificate of Service on defendant Corveta, Inc., | ||
Att: 12 Certificate of Service on defendant Daikin America, Inc., | ||
Att: 13 Certificate of Service on defendant Deepwater Chemicals, Inc., | ||
Att: 14 Certificate of Service on defendant Dynax Corporation, | ||
Att: 15 Certificate of Service on defendant E.I. Du Pont de Nemours & Co., Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 16 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc., | ||
Att: 17 Certificate of Service on defendant Fire-Dex, LLC, | ||
Att: 18 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Holding Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 19 Certificate of Service on defendant Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC, | ||
Att: 20 Certificate of Service on defendant Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 21 Certificate of Service on defendant Innotex Corporation, | ||
Att: 22 Certificate of Service on defendant Johnson Controls, Inc., | ||
Att: 23 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde Fire Fighting, Inc., (f/k/a Chubb National Foam, Inc., f/k/a National Foam, Inc.), | ||
Att: 24 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., (f/k/a Fenwal, Inc), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 25 Certificate of Service on defendant Lakeland Industries, Inc., | ||
Att: 26 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Apparel, Inc., | ||
Att: 27 Certificate of Service on defendant Lion Group, Inc., | ||
Att: 28 Certificate of Service on defendant L.N. Curtis & Sons, | ||
Att: 29 Certificate of Service on defendant Mallory Safety and Supply, LLC, | ||
Att: 30 Certificate of Service on defendant Milliken & Company, | ||
Att: 31 Certificate of Service on defendant Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, | ||
Att: 32 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Incorporated, | ||
Att: 33 Certificate of Service on defendant MSA Safety Sales, LLC, | ||
Att: 34 Certificate of Service on defendant Municipal Emergency Services, Inc., | ||
Att: 35 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote Holding Corporation (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 36 Certificate of Service on defendant Narcote, LLC (f/k/a Stedfast, Inc., and/or Stedfast USA, Inc.), | ||
Att: 37 Certificate of Service on defendant Nation Ford Chemical Company, | ||
Att: 38 Certificate of Service on defendant National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 39 Certificate of Service on defendant PBI Performance Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 40 Certificate of Service on defendant Perimeter Solutions, LP, | ||
Att: 41 Certificate of Service on defendant Ricochet Manufacturing Co., Inc., | ||
Att: 42 Certificate of Service on defendant Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc., | ||
Att: 43 Certificate of Service on defendant Stedfast USA, Inc., | ||
Att: 44 Certificate of Service on defendant Tencate Protective Fabrics USA, d/b/a Southern Mills, Inc., | ||
Att: 45 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company FC, LLC, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 46 Certificate of Service on defendant The Chemours Company, Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise, | ||
Att: 47 Certificate of Service on defendant Tyco Fire Products, L.P. as Successor-In-Interest to The Ansul Company, | ||
Att: 48 Certificate of Service on defendant United Technologies Corporation, | ||
Att: 49 Certificate of Service on defendant UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation, Inc. (f/k/a GE Interlogix, Inc.), Individually as as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc., | ||
Att: 50 Certificate of Service on defendant Veridian Limited d/b/a Veridian Fire Protective Gear, | ||
Att: 51 Certificate of Service on defendant Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc., d/b/a "The Fire Store", | ||
Att: 52 Certificate of Service on defendant W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc., | ||
Att: 53 Certificate of Service on defendant Arkema, Inc., | ||
Att: 54 Certificate of Service on defendant Chemdesign Products, Inc., | ||
Att: 55 Certificate of Service on defendant Kidde PLC, Inc., (f/k/a Williams US Inc., f/k/a Williams Holdins, Inc.), Individually and as Successor-In-Interest to National Foam, Inc. | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 4:02 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 07/22 3:12 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Northern Illinois (associated as of 7/18/2024), 1:24-cv-05514, Smith et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04015-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 07/22 3:10 PM
Case transferred in from District of Illinois Northern; Case Number 1:24-cv-05514. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, July 18, 2024 | ||
9 | 9 TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina the electronic record. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
8 | 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER from MDL Panel transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. (jh, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to MDL 2873 Conditional Transfer Order filed 7/18/2024. (jh, ) Modified on 7/18/2024 (jh, ). [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
7 | 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Caryl Fancher, James Fancher, Joseph Gleason, Lisa Marie Gleason, Carmel Maloney, Patrick Maloney, Arthur Noonan, Denise Noonan, Catherine Platt, Joseph Platt, Dwayne Smith, Sandra Smith by Mitchell Wald Bild (Bild, Mitchell) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
6 | 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Caryl Fancher, James Fancher, Joseph Gleason, Lisa Marie Gleason, Carmel Maloney, Patrick Maloney, Arthur Noonan, Denise Noonan, Catherine Platt, Joseph Platt, Dwayne Smith, Sandra Smith by William T Gibbs (Gibbs, William) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
5 | 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Caryl Fancher, James Fancher, Joseph Gleason, Lisa Marie Gleason, Carmel Maloney, Patrick Maloney, Arthur Noonan, Denise Noonan, Catherine Platt, Joseph Platt, Dwayne Smith, Sandra Smith by Kenneth Thomas Lumb (Lumb, Kenneth) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (mcp, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | ||
Saturday, June 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant 3M Company by Daniel Leslie Ring (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
3 | 3 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by 3M Company (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (2024-L-5837) filed by 3M Company Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22196267.(Ring, Daniel) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 7/22/2024.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint |