Daugherty v. Commissioner of Social Security
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph S Van Bokkelen |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-00306 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Commencement of SSA Action
Thu 07/25 12:30 PM
Notice of Commencement of Social Security Appeal action (1 Complaint) sent to the Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security Answer or Motion due 9/23/2024. Pursuant to General Order #2022-20, the briefing schedule is as follows: The plaintiff's opening brief must be filed within 42 days after the answer is filed or 42 days after entry of an order disposing of the last remaining motion under Rule 4(c) of the Supplemental Rules, whichever is later. The Commissioner's response brief must be filed 42 days after service of the opening brief. Any reply brief must be filed 14 days after service of the response brief. (mrm) |
|
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Thu 07/25 12:29 PM
ORDER GRANTING4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pla Jennifer Daugherty. WAIVING the filing fee in this case; and DIRECTING the Clerk to docket a Notice of Commencement of SSA Action. Signed by Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen on 7/25/2024. (mrm) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 07/24 9:40 AM
**NEW CASE**IFP PENDING** Judge Joseph S Van Bokkelen added. (nae) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/23 10:14 AM
First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jennifer Daugherty. (Richter, Matthew) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 10:07 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas T Lavella on behalf of Jennifer Daugherty (Lavella, Nicholas) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/23 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F Richter on behalf of Jennifer Daugherty (Richter, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 9:59 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Jennifer Daugherty.(Richter, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |