Rocci v. WILLS EYE HOSPITAL
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kai N Scott |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03245 |
Nature of Suit | 111 Civil - Miscellaneous |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Philadelphia Court of Common Pleas, 240602210 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:33 AM EDT |
Defendant
WILLS EYE HOSPITAL
840 Walnut Street
Philadelphia, PA 19107 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lorraine Rocci
Individually, and on behalf of all others similarly situated 1112 Foxmeadow Drive
Royersford, PA 19468 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 29, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum
Thu 08/29 1:18 PM
Memorandum in Support re6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WILLS EYE HOSPITAL. (Freeman, Nathalie) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 08/29 1:15 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by WILLS EYE HOSPITAL.Certificate of Service.(Freeman, Nathalie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/29 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by EDWARD J. MCANDREW on behalf of WILLS EYE HOSPITAL with Jury Demand; Certificate of Service(MCANDREW, EDWARD) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 07/29 9:53 AM
ORDER THAT THE CONSENT3 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED BY WILLS EYE HOSPITAL IS GRANTED. THE DEADLINE FOR WILLS EYE HOSPITAL TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED THROUGH 8/29/24. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE KAI N. SCOTT ON 7/26/24.7/29/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) |
|
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/26 2:36 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by WILLS EYE HOSPITAL.Certificate of Service.(Freeman, Nathalie) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
misc
State Court Record - Attachment
Wed 07/24 2:45 PM
State Court record received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (CCP - Philadelphia County cv, ) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal (Attorney)
Tue 07/23 10:09 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WILLS EYE HOSPITAL (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17618478), filed by WILLS EYE HOSPITAL.(Freeman, Nathalie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Designation Form |