K. v. ByteDance, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers |
Case #: | 4:24-cv-04431 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:44 AM PDT |
Defendant
ByteDance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ByteDance, Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Google, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, LLC
|
|
Defendant
TikTok, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
YouTube, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
K. K.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, August 19, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Mon 08/19 11:49 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by K. K. (Warren, Previn) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal
Fri 08/02 12:26 PM
Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Unopposed filed by K. K..(Warren, Previn) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Wed 07/24 2:27 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19654803.). Filed by K. K.. (Warren, Previn) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 11:08 AM
Summons Issued as to ByteDance, Inc., ByteDance, Ltd, Google, LLC, TikTok, Inc., TikTok, LLC, TikTok, Ltd., YouTube, LLC. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/24 11:02 AM
DIRECT MEMBER CASE OPENED: 22-md-3047-YGR Opened in California Northern District as 4:24-cv-4431-YGR cc: JPMDL. (cjl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/23 4:08 PM
Case assigned to Judge Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (kxo, COURT STAFF) |
|
2 | 2
2
pgs
misc
Proposed Summons
Tue 07/23 7:47 AM
Proposed Summons. (Warren, Previn) |
|
1 | 1
9
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 7:45 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19647338.). Filed by Katie Kolenda.(Warren, Previn) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |