15
|
|
15
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines
Fri 09/06 4:34 PM
ORDER THAT THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS RESCHEDULED TO 9/11/24 AT 8:30 A.M. IN CHAMBERS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 9/6/24. 9/6/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
misc
Report Of
Wed 09/04 11:07 AM
Report Of Rule 26(f) Meeting by KAZMIER COLLAZO. (GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/28 2:27 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP.(BERDZIK, CAROLINE)
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
1
pgs
order
Order Setting Answer Deadline
Thu 08/22 8:46 AM
ORDER THAT THE DEFENDANTS SHALL RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT BY 9/4/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/22/24. 8/22/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
misc
Stipulation
Wed 08/21 4:48 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Consent Order Extending Time to Respond to Pleading by 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP. (COLE, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/21 10:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAZMIER COLLAZO re: Timothy L. Weldon served Summons and Complaint upon PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP by Process Server. PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP served on 8/16/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/21 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAZMIER COLLAZO re: Timothy L. Weldon served Summons and Complaint upon 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP by Process Server. 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP served on 8/16/2024, answer due 9/6/2024. (GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/21 10:28 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLINE J. BERDZIK on behalf of 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP with Certificate of Service(BERDZIK, CAROLINE)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Tue 08/20 5:11 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ANGELA ALLEN CRONK on behalf of 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP(CRONK, ANGELA)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/20 11:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY S. COLE on behalf of 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP with Certificate of Service(COLE, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/08 12:04 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by KAZMIER COLLAZO re: Timothy L. Weldon served Summons and Complaint upon PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE by Process Server. PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE served on 7/31/2024, answer due 8/21/2024. (GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
5
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/29 9:06 AM
ORDER THAT A PRETRIAL CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 9/10/2024 08:30 AM IN Judge's Chambers, ROOM 9400, BEFORE DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 7/29/24. 7/29/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(bw)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/25 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ANGELA ALLEN CRONK on behalf of 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP with Certificate of Service(CRONK, ANGELA)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 3:21 PM
Summons Issued as to 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/23/24 (JL)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/23 10:53 AM
COMPLAINT against 3300 HENRY AVENUE OPERATING COMPANY LP, PEDIATRIC SPECIALTY CARE, PP PEDIATRIC MANAGEMENT LP ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17618833.), filed by KAZMIER COLLAZO.(GURMANKIN, CAREN)
Related: [-]
|