Schoep v. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick J Schiltz |
Referred: | Dulce J Foster |
Case #: | 0:24-cv-02881 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
ReliaStar Life Insurance Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Shanna Schoep
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 08/15 9:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Shanna Schoep. ReliaStar Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/1/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (Phomtalikhith, Pounnaphone) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 12:21 PM
Summons Issued as to ReliaStar Life Insurance Company. (MKB) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Tue 07/23 12:20 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per Civil (3rd, 4th - Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge Dulce J. Foster. Please use case number 24-cv-2881 (PJS/DJF). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB) |
|
1 | 1
8
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 10:41 AM
COMPLAINT against ReliaStar Life Insurance Company (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11210698) filed by Shanna Schoep. Filer requests summons issued. (Phomtalikhith, Pounnaphone) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |