SOSA-MOYA v. CATALANO
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Cynthia M Rufe |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03249 |
Nature of Suit | 462 Immigration - Naturalization Application |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:34 AM EDT |
Defendant
MICHAEL A. CATALANO
|
|
Plaintiff
Sahyly SOSA-MOYA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney
Mon 08/05 11:07 AM
Acceptance of Service by U.S. Attorney Re: accepted summons and complaint on behalf of the United States Attorney (only). (sg) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Thu 07/25 8:17 AM
ORDER THAT THE APPLICATION OF ANTHONY RICHARD DOMINGUEZ, ESQUIRE FOR PRO HAC VICE (ECF NO.5 ) IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 07/24/2024.07/25/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment)
Wed 07/24 12:02 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17622506.) filed by Sahyly SOSA-MOYA.Certificate of Service.(HOFFMANN, KAREN) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Wed 07/24 9:55 AM
Summons Issued as to MICHAEL A. CATALANO, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 7/24/2024. EMAILED TO US ATTORNEY WITH ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE. (sg) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/23 3:46 PM
NOTICE by Sahyly SOSA-MOYA Designation Form (HOFFMANN, KAREN) |
|
2 | 2
trial
Exhibit
Tue 07/23 1:42 PM
EXHIBIT by Sahyly SOSA-MOYA.. (HOFFMANN, KAREN) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/23 1:34 PM
COMPLAINT against MICHAEL A. CATALANO ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17619618.), filed by Sahyly SOSA-MOYA.(HOFFMANN, KAREN) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
Attorney Required Forms
Tue 07/23 1:56 PM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. Civil Box was not checked off. (sbt) |