Fernandez v. The City of New York et al.
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Cheryl L Pollak |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-05120 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
The City of New York
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sergeant John Doe
|
|
Defendant
John Does #1-5
|
|
Plaintiff
Peter Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Fri 08/30 11:54 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An Initial Conference is set for 11/26/2024 @ 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Initial conference will proceed via CISCO conference call. Please dial 571-353-2301 at 10:15 AM. Enter Meeting ID: 022-788-537. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/30/2024. (DC) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 08/30 11:37 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer until October 21, 2024 by The City of New York. (O'Flynn, Mary) |
|
order
Status Report Order
Fri 08/30 8:55 AM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: The plaintiff is Ordered to provide a status letter to this Court within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Status Report due by 9/30/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/30/2024. (DC) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 08/30 11:48 AM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer - answer due 10/21/2024. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak on 8/30/2024. (DC) |
||
Thursday, August 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/01 1:06 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Peter Fernandez. The City of New York served on 8/1/2024, answer due 8/22/2024. (Cerbin, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Wed 07/24 8:38 AM
APPROVAL re2 Motion for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. Signed Brenna B. Mahoney, Clerk of Court by Tiffeny Lee-Harris, Case Administration Manager on 7/24/2024. (fwd'd for processing) (TLH) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Tue 07/23 3:40 PM
Summons Issued as to The City of New York. (KD) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 07/23 3:38 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (KD) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 07/23 3:35 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (KD) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Refund of Fees Paid Electronically
Tue 07/23 3:16 PM
MOTION for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically by Peter Fernandez. (Cerbin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 receipt, | ||
Att: 2 receipt | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 2:56 PM
COMPLAINT against The City of New York filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18097932 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Peter Fernandez. (Cerbin, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
misc
Civil Case Filing Fee
Tue 07/23 2:51 PM
CIVIL CASE FILING FEE: $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18097906 (Cerbin, Scott) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/23 3:33 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (KD) |