BAILEY v. NOVO NORDISK A/S et al
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Karen S Marston |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-03257 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:35 AM EDT |
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK A/S
|
|
Defendant
NOVO NORDISK INC.
|
|
Plaintiff
ERIKA BAILEY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 9:14 AM
Summons Issued as to NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC.. Forwarded To: E-MAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 7/24/24 (JL) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
32
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney)
Tue 07/23 2:22 PM
7/23/2024) (sbt). COMPLAINT against NOVO NORDISK A/S, NOVO NORDISK INC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17620104.), filed by ERIKA BAILEY.(SEDGH, JONATHAN) (Attachment 1 replaced on (Attachment 1 replaced on 7/23/2024) (sbt). |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Designation Form | ||
misc
MDL Member Case
Tue 07/23 3:50 PM
MDL-3094 (Judge MARSTON) Member Case. PAED. Case number in EDPA: 24-cv-3257. (sbt) |