Dequeant v. Lafayette Parish et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Robert R Summerhays |
Referred: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00978 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
School System of Lafayette Parish
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Youngsville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kandice Dequeant
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 08/07 3:29 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint by School System of Lafayette Parish.(aty,Blake, Jonathan) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/05 1:24 PM
ANSWER to Amended Complaint and Fourth Supplemental Petition by City of Youngsville.(aty,Trahan, Kevin) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
respm
Response to Motion
Tue 07/30 8:07 AM
RESPONSE to REMOVAL ORDER Certified Copy of Records filed by City of Youngsville. (aty,Trahan, Kevin) Modified on 7/30/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
misc
Response (NOT Motions)
Tue 07/30 10:38 AM
Answer to Lafayette Parish School System's Reconventional Demand & Amended & Supplemental Reconventional Demand by Kandice Dequeant. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/30 10:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint to Second Supplemental & Amending Petition by City of Youngsville. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/30 11:26 AM
Judgment granting State Court Peremptory Exception of No Cause of Action allowing plaintiff to amend Second Amended & Supplemental Petition for Damages. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/30 11:28 AM
ANSWER to Second Supplemental & Amending Petition by School System of Lafayette Parish. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 07/30 11:32 AM
THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDED COMPLAINT against School System of Lafayette Parish, City of Youngsville filed by Kandice Dequeant. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 07/30 11:35 AM
ANSWER to Third Supplemental & Amended Petition by School System of Lafayette Parish. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Tue 07/30 11:42 AM
ANSWER to Third Amended Complaint by City of Youngsville. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 07/30 11:48 AM
FOURTH SUPPLEMENTAL & AMENDED Petition for Damages against School System of Lafayette Parish, City of Youngsville filed by Kandice Dequeant. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order.(crt,Crick, S) |
||
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 07/30 11:54 AM
State Court Judgment granting Peremptory Exception of No Cause of Action Relative to Plaintiff's Claims for Abuse of Process and Malicious Prosecution. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at4 Response to Removal Order. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
order
Removal Order
Wed 07/24 2:17 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/24/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 07/24 9:43 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER. Referred to Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2024. (crt,Miletello, A) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/23 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Removal from 15th JDC Lafayette Parish, Case Number C-2023-4879 filed by City of Youngsville.(Attorney Kevin Wade Trahan added to party City of Youngsville(pty:dft))(aty,Trahan, Kevin) Modified docket text on 7/23/2024 (Miletello, A) |
|
Att: 1 Civil cover sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Amended Petition, | ||
Att: 3 Verification | ||
transfer
Divisional Transfer
Tue 07/23 2:12 PM
DIVISIONAL TRANSFER of Old Case Number 1:23-cv-0978 from Alexandria Division to Lafayette Division. New Case Number 6:23-cv-0978 . (crt,Miletello, A) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/24 9:39 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Robert R Summerhays and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Miletello, A) |