Camp v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brenda K Sannes |
Referred: | Mitchell J Katz |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00905 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:1383 Review of HHS Decision |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 07/24 11:44 AM
TEXT ORDER granting3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Mitchell J. Katz on 7/24/2024. (ztc) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Wed 07/24 10:06 AM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Shannon Fishel appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/22/2024. (Fishel, Shannon) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Tue 07/23 4:04 PM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Plaintiff does not consent, the case has been assigned to a District Judge and a Magistrate Judge consistent with General Order #12. . Social Security Consent/Declination Form due by 8/13/2024. (ham) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Tue 07/23 4:02 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY DECLINATION FORM filed by Nicole Rae Camp advising of declination of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ham) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/23 4:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Nicole Rae Camp. (ham) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Tue 07/23 4:00 PM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (ham) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Tue 07/23 3:54 PM
COMPLAINT with Exhibits - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] .(ham) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |