Kaufman Orthopedic Pain Management, PLLC v. Jordan et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Reed C O'Connor |
Case #: | 7:24-cv-00102 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 5:50 AM CDT |
Defendant
Ashley Bullard
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jacob Jordan
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kaufman Orthopedic Pain Management, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation
Fri 09/13 2:07 PM
Joint STIPULATION Stay Discovery by Kaufman Orthopedic Pain Management, PLLC. (Boyce, Reagan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
9
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Tue 08/27 3:28 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REPORT FOR CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER: The Joint Report shall be filed on or before September 24, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Reed C. O'Connor on 8/27/2024) (mmw) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Mon 08/26 10:04 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ashley Bullard, Jacob Jordan. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Branum, Daniel) |
|
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/26 9:58 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Ashley Bullard. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice.Attorney Daniel Mark Branum added to party Ashley Bullard(pty:dft) (Branum, Daniel) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/26 9:57 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,, with Jury Demand filed by Jacob Jordan. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Branum, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
10 | 10
respm
Appendix in Support
Mon 08/26 9:27 PM
Appendix in Support filed by Jacob Jordan re9 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Branum, Daniel) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 08/26 9:24 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Jacob Jordan re8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Branum, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Mon 08/26 9:21 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction () filed by Jacob Jordan Attorney Daniel Mark Branum added to party Jacob Jordan(pty:dft) (Branum, Daniel) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned
Mon 08/05 2:46 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Ashley Bullard ; served on 8/5/2024. (Boyce, Reagan) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Additional Attachments to Main Document
Fri 08/02 9:33 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiff Kaufman Orthopedic Pain Management, PLLC. (Boyce, Reagan) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 07/24 9:08 AM
Summons Issued as to Ashley Bullard, Jacob Jordan. (mmw) |
|
4 | 4
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Wed 07/24 9:06 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: No court file needed. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mmw) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
qcref
O' Connor (WICHITA FALLS CASES)
Tue 07/23 4:13 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. File to: Judge O'Connor Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (No magistrate judge assigned). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mmw) |
|
1 | 1
43
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ashley Bullard, Jacob Jordan filed by KAUFMAN ORTHOPEDIC PAIN MANAGEMENT, PLLC D/B/A GENESIS WELLNESS AND PAIN. (Filer fee note- Filed by the USA) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Boyce, Reagan) |