D.P. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-04449 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:45 AM PDT |
Defendant
Raiser, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Uber Technologies, Inc.
150 California Street 15th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
|
Defendant
Rasier-CA, LLC
818 West Seventh Street Suite 930
Los Angeles, CA 90017 |
|
Plaintiff
D.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Wed 07/24 1:19 PM
Case assigned to Judge Charles R. Breyer. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Wed 07/24 2:05 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file [1-2] Certificate of Interested Persons as a separate entry on the docket using the event 'Certificate of Interested Persons' under the Other Filings/Notices category. Re:[1-2] Certificate of Interested Persons, filed by D.P. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
6
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 1:40 PM
COMPLAINT (Short Form Complaint) against Raiser, LLC, Uber Technologies, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19649664.). Filed by D.P.(Hilton, Layne) Modified on 7/23/2024 (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Interested Persons | ||
utility
Create Case Association
Tue 07/23 3:24 PM
Cases associated: Create association to 3:23-md-03084-CRB. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
utility
MDL Member Case
Wed 07/24 2:02 PM
DIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 3084, D.P. v. Uber Technologies, Inc. et al, Opened in California Northern District as 24-cv-04449-CRB cc: JPMDL (mcl, COURT STAFF) |