Lacy et al v. Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Mark L Hornsby |
Case #: | 5:24-cv-00981 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Case in other court: | 1st Judicial District Court Parish of Caddo, 650992 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 4:07 AM CDT |
Defendant
Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sharon Gamble
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Lacy
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
order
Jurisdictional Review Finding
Thu 08/08 4:29 PM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1332. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 8/8/2024. (crt,Rider, M) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/07 1:43 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Sharon Gamble, James Lacy by Sharon Gamble, James Lacy. (aty,Lorio, Philip) Modified on 8/7/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/05 10:06 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co.(aty,DuPont, Sallie) |
|
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
order
Removal Order
Thu 07/25 1:49 PM
REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby on 7/25/2024. (crt,Breite, S) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Response to Removal Order
Wed 07/24 3:58 PM
RESPONSE TO REMOVAL ORDER by Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co .(aty,Bargas, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 State Court Motion for Extension of Time, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal | ||
6 | 6
misc
Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/24 3:57 PM
DIVERSITY JURISDICTION DISCLOSURE STATEMENT for Sharon Gamble, James Lacy, Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co by Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Bargas, Valerie) Modified on 7/24/2024 to modify docket text. (Crick, S) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/24 3:50 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent Farmers Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Truck Insurance Exchange, Corporate Parent Fire Insurance Exchange for Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co. (aty,Bargas, Valerie) |
|
4 | 4
motion
Proposed Order (Court User Only/Public Entry No NEF)
Wed 07/24 9:48 AM
PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER Referred to Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 07/24 9:43 AM
NOTICE of Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Valerie Briggs Bargas, Philip Donatien Lorio, IV on behalf of Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co, Sharon Gamble, James Lacy. Diversity Jurisdiction Disclosure Statement due by 8/7/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement (Form Included)
Wed 07/24 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re:1 Notice of Removal sent to Valerie Briggs Bargas on behalf of Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 8/7/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Tue 07/23 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Removal and Request for Trial by Jury from 1st JDC Caddo Parish, Case Number 650992 with Jury Demand; (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6006541) filed by Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co.(Attorney Valerie Briggs Bargas added to party Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Bargas, Valerie) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Petition for Damages, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Plaintiffs' Demand, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Certified Policy, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit of Valerie Briggs Bargas, | ||
Att: 6 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal | ||
service
State Court Service Returned Executed (Removal Cases)
Wed 07/24 9:27 AM
STATE COURT Service Returned Executed. Farmers Property & Casualty Insurance Co answer due 7/30/2024. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY. The PDF image can be found at Attachment #2 to1 Notice of Removal. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 07/24 9:40 AM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Mark L Hornsby. (crt,Crick, S) |