Hebert v. Social Security
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Carol B Whitehurst |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00980 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/13/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/30 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kerry Kemp on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Attorney Kerry Kemp added to party Commissioner of Social Security(pty:dft)) (aty,Kemp, Kerry) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 1:30 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for appearance of Edward Allen Wicklund for Christopher T Hebert. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst on 7/24/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 07/24 8:39 AM
MOTION for Edward A. Wicklund to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Admission fee: $105, receipt number ALAWDC-6006839) by Christopher T. Hebert. Motions referred to Carol B Whitehurst. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 7/24/2024.(aty,Misko, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
appeal
Social Security Scheduling Order
Tue 07/23 4:03 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER issued. (crt,Crick, S) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6006471) filed by Christopher T. Hebert.(Attorney Benjamin M Misko added to party Christopher T. Hebert(pty:pla))(aty,Misko, Benjamin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Notice of Appeal Council Action, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 07/23 3:59 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Carol B Whitehurst. (crt,Crick, S) |
||
service
Service of Complaint on USA (Social Security)
Tue 07/23 4:01 PM
SERVICE of Complaint on the Commissioner of Social Security through the United States Attorney's Office by the Courts electronic case management system pursuant to the Supplemental Rules for Social Security actions Under 42 U.S.C. Section 405(g). Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/23/2024, answer due 9/23/2024. (crt,Crick, S) |