9
|
|
9
misc
Letter
Tue 08/27 12:31 PM
Letter re: IFP and Payment from Frank Johnson.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Envelope
|
8
|
|
8
cmp
Complaint
Tue 08/27 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT against Sanjay Agarwal, K Petersen, J Kuykendall (Filing fee due $ 405.). Filed by Frank Johnson. Consent/Declination due by 9/25/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Envelope
|
7
|
|
7
1
pgs
order
Order Reassigning Case ~Util - Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/26 1:08 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by Clerk on 8/26/2024.(ark, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
|
6
|
|
6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice of Impending Reassignment
Mon 08/26 12:01 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (rmm2, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Envelope service/mailing label
|
5
|
|
5
misc
Letter
Sun 08/11 7:12 PM
Letter from Frank Johnson for and Extension of Time and Appoint Attorney. No envelope. (kmg, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/11/2024 (kmg, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
oth_evt
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 07/23 3:09 PM
Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: IFP
Tue 07/23 3:08 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 8/30/2024. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice to File Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint/Habeas Petition on Form
Tue 07/23 3:05 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Complaint on Form due by 8/30/2024. (gba, COURT STAFF) Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
misc
Letter
Tue 07/23 2:59 PM
Letter dated 6/2/2024 from Frank Johnson. (gba, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Envelope
|