Jeremy Holland v. Jorge Luis Vera et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen V Wilson |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-06177 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 07, 2024 2:25 AM PDT |
Defendant
Hector Leonel Ortiz Garcia
|
|
Defendant
Jorge Luis Vera
|
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Holland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held
Wed 08/14 4:32 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. For the foregoing reasons, the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction and dismisses Plaintiff's state law causes of action (claims two through five). (See document for further details). (aco) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Response
Thu 08/08 10:43 AM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Hollandto Order to Show Cause,,10 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction(Kim, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration | ||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
2
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 07/25 2:48 PM
MINUTES OF ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND ORDER FOR JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause within 14 days of this order. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the dismissal of the entire action without prejudice or the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims and the dismissal of any such claims pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1367(c). (SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER DETAILS). (aco) |
|
9 | 9
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Thu 07/25 12:17 PM
NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The courtesy copy requirement is presently suspended. (pc) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Wed 07/24 10:31 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Hector Leonel Ortiz Garcia, Jorge Luis Vera. (et) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form
Wed 07/24 10:29 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 07/24 10:28 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 07/24 10:28 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Summons Request
Tue 07/23 3:03 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties
Tue 07/23 3:02 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 07/23 3:02 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Holland. (Kim, Jason) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 07/23 3:01 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37884767 - Fee: $405. (Attorney Jason J. Kim added to party Jeremy Holland(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason) |