Maryland District Court
Judge:Deborah L Boardman
Case #: 8:24-cv-02130
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 23, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 19, 2025 4:10 AM EST
Defendant
State Farm Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By
Laura Basem Jacobs
Budow And Noble, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
William Young
6701 Purple Lilac Lane
Clinton, MD 20735

GPO Oct 16 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 10/16/2024. (C/M 10/16/2024 bas, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Mar 26 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Deborah L. Boardman on 3/26/2025. (c/m 3/26/2025 bas, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
61 61 appeal USCA Case Number Tue 04/29 4:17 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1461 for59 Notice of Appeal filed by William Young - Case Manager - Kirsten Hancock. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
60 60 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 04/25 3:37 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re59 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis,
Att: 2 Affidavit to Proceed in Forma Pauperis