Cook v. Phillips et al
Tennessee Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Eli J Richardson |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-00895 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, August 15, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Thu 08/15 10:15 AM
Letter from Ashley Cook re Order5 . (kc) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order Assessing Filing Fee Order Staying Case ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 07/30 4:51 PM
ORDER: Ashley Cook, an inmate of the Women's Therapeutic Residential Center, has filed a pro se civil rights Complaint (Doc. No.1 ) and an application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (IFP). (Doc. No.2 .) Because it appears from Plaintiff's IFP application that she lacks the funds to pay the entire filing fee, that application (Doc. No.2 ) is GRANTED and a $350 filing fee is ASSESSED. The fee will be collected in installments as described below. The warden of the facility in which Plaintiff is currently housed, as custodian of her trust account, is DIRECTED to submit to the Clerk of Court, an initial payment. The Clerk of Court MUST send a copy of this Order to the warden of the facility in which Plaintiff is currently housed to ensure compliance with that portion of 28 U.S.C. § 1915 pertaining to the payment of the filing fee. Accordingly, proceedings in this case are hereby STAYED pending further order of the Court after resolution of related matters in Harris, No. 3:19-cv-00174. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 07/30/24. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. A copy of this Order mailed to the warden.) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (ad) |
|
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ
Tue 07/23 4:51 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (kc) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Admin Order 217
Tue 07/23 4:50 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (kc) |
|
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 07/23 4:50 PM
APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Ashley M. Cook. (kc) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 07/23 4:49 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe #1, Amber L. Phillips, filed by Ashley M. Cook.(kc) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-10 | ||
misc
Annotation - Docket
Tue 07/23 4:52 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form included). (kc) |