Conn's, Inc. and Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Alfredo R Perez |
Case #: | 4:24-bk-33357 |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Conn's, Inc.
2445 Technology Forest Blvd Ste 800
The Woodlands, TX 77381-5258 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002 |
1. | Conn's files for Chapter 11 bankruptcy (retaildive.com) |
Submitted Tue 08/20/2024 | |
Docket last updated: 40 minutes ago |
Saturday, September 14, 2024 | ||
627 | 627
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Sat 09/14 8:27 AM
Order Granting Motion for Scott J. Freedman To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/14/2024. (abm4) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
626 | 626
misc
Declaration
Fri 09/13 7:20 PM
Declaration re: Declaration of Disinterestedness of Wilson & Franco LLC Pursuant to the Order Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business (Filed By Conn's, Inc. ) (McFaul, Duston) |
|
625 | 625
misc
Statement
Fri 09/13 6:15 PM
Statement | Second Monthly Fee Statement of Sidley Austin LLP for Compensation of Services Rendered and Reimbursement of Expenses as Counsel to the Debtors and Debtors in Possession for the Period from August 1, 2024 to and including August 31, 2024 (Filed By Conn's, Inc. ). (McFaul, Duston) |
|
624 | 624
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/13 4:43 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Joel Frederic Newell Filed by on behalf of Westfest LLC (Newell, Joel) |
|
623 | 623
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/13 4:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Tara T. LeDay Filed by on behalf of Ambassador Way Shopping Center, LLC, Collin Creek Associates, LLC, Fairway Phase III Associates, LP (LeDay, Tara) |
|
622 | 622
misc
Response
Fri 09/13 3:54 PM
Response (Filed By Kimco Realty Corporation ) (Shriro, Michelle) |
|
621 | 621
plan
Response/Objection
Fri 09/13 3:42 PM
Response/Objection Filed by Westfest LLC. (Newell, Joel) |
|
620 | 620
motion
Objection to Notice of Mortgage Payment Change and Motion for Determination
Fri 09/13 3:22 PM
Objection to Notice of Mortgage Payment Change and Motion for Determination of Mortgage Payment Amount Filed by Creditor Parkdale Plaza-I, L.P. (Henry, Marc) |
|
619 | 619
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 3:09 PM
Objection Limited Objection of Corcentric, LLC to Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by Corcentric, LLC (Freedman, Scott) |
|
618 | 618
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 3:07 PM
Objection Limited Objection to Cure Notice . Filed by CAP Industrial Park I, LLC (Shelby, Patrick) |
|
617 | 617
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 3:03 PM
Objection - G&P Properties' Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights to The Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by G&P Properties (Shannon, R. J.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Lease | ||
616 | 616
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/13 2:25 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeffrey Burley Filed by on behalf of Epic West USA LLC (Burley, Jeffrey) |
|
615 | 615
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 2:24 PM
Objection to Notice of Potential Assumption and Assignment . Filed by Epic West USA LLC (Burley, Jeffrey) |
|
614 | 614
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 09/13 2:19 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Scott J. Freedman (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25567416) Filed by Creditor Corcentric, LLC (Freedman, Scott) |
|
613 | 613
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 1:27 PM
Objection to Assumption and/or Assignment of Unexpired Lease Absent Proper Cure, and Reservation of Rights [Related to Docket #459] . Filed by Spirit Realty, L.P. (Terry, Wayne) |
|
612 | 612
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 1:18 PM
Objection and Reservation of Rights of Prologis, L.P., PLD USLF Airways DC LLC, and Liberty Property Limited Partnership to Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by Liberty Property Limited Partnership, PLD USLF Airways DC LLC, Prologics, L.P. (Perry, Kristen) |
|
611 | 611
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 1:17 PM
Objection and Reservation of Rights of MO Athens, LLC to the Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts and Proposed Sale . Filed by MO Athens, LLC (Matthews, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Itemization | ||
610 | 610
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/13 12:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jarrod B. Martin Filed by on behalf of Collin Creek Associates, LLC, Fairway Phase III Associates, LP, Ambassador Way Shopping Center, LLC (Martin, Jarrod) |
|
609 | 609
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 12:01 PM
Objection to Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by Horne-River Ridge II, L.P. (Myer, Christina) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 2nd Lease Amendment | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1st Lease Amendment | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Original Lease Excerpt | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Tenant Ledger (last page for 2024 to date) | ||
Att: 5 Proposed Order | ||
608 | 608
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 11:42 AM
Objection and Reservation of Rights of Levy Bandera Oaks, LLC to Debtors' Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by Levy Bandera Oaks, LLC (Chapple, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
607 | 607
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Fri 09/13 11:40 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Christina Grey Myer Filed by on behalf of Horne-River Ridge II, L.P. (Myer, Christina) |
|
606 | 606
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 11:32 AM
Objection to Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by J&J Coldwater, LLC (Geppert, Andrew) |
|
605 | 605
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 10:51 AM
Objection Brookwood MSC LLC's Objection to Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Cure Amounts . Filed by Brookwood MSC, LLC (Parrish, Jimmy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Ledger | ||
604 | 604
notice
Notice
Fri 09/13 10:37 AM
Notice of Reservation of Rights to the Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts and Proposed Sale . Filed by Tempur Sealy International, Inc. and its affiliates including Tempur-Pedic North America, LLC, Sealy Mattress Manufacturing Company, LLC and Tempur Sherwood, LLC (Matthews, Rebecca) |
|
603 | 603
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 9:13 AM
Objection and Reservation of Rights of Commercial Property Associates, LLC to the Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by Commercial Property Associates (Matthews, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Itemization | ||
602 | 602
answer
Objection
Fri 09/13 9:08 AM
Objection and Reservation of Rights to Notice of Potential Assumption of Unexpired Leases . Filed by Town Center Mall, LP (Roberts, Mark) |
|
601 | 601
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Fri 09/13 8:21 AM
Order Granting Motion for Christopher J. Fong To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/13/2024. (abm4) |
|
600 | 600
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Fri 09/13 8:18 AM
Order Granting Motion for Mark Edgarton To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/13/2024. (abm4) |
|
599 | 599
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Fri 09/13 8:15 AM
Order Granting Motion for Jacqueline L. James To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/13/2024. (abm4) |
|
598 | 598
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Fri 09/13 8:09 AM
Order Granting Motion for Christina Grey Myer To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/13/2024. (abm4) (Main Document 598 replaced on 9/13/2024) (AkeitaHouse) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
597 | 597
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 4:45 PM
Objection to the Notice Of (I) Potential Assumption And Assignment Of Executory Contracts And Unexpired Leases And (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by Fidelitone Freight Forwarding Services, LLC, Fidelitone Last Mile Brokerage, LLC (Zugaro, Nicholas) |
|
596 | 596
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/12 4:38 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christopher J. Fong (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25564806) Filed by Creditors Fidelitone Freight Forwarding Services, LLC, Fidelitone Last Mile Brokerage, LLC (Zugaro, Nicholas) |
|
595 | 595
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/12 2:59 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mark Edgarton (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25564359) Filed by Creditor BRF Finance Co., LLC (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
594 | 594
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/12 2:57 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Patricia B. Tomasco Filed by on behalf of BRF Finance Co., LLC (Tomasco, Patricia) |
|
593 | 593
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 2:53 PM
Objection Limited Objection and Reservation of Rights of BRI 2240 North Lane Avenue, LLC to the Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts . Filed by BRI 2240 North Lane Avenue, LLC (Ramsey, Shane) |
|
592 | 592
notice
Notice
Thu 09/12 2:52 PM
Notice of Objection . Filed by Centennial Parks, LLC (fmc2) |
|
591 | 591
notice
Notice
Thu 09/12 2:49 PM
Notice of Objection . Filed by Clayton 75 LC, Inc. (fmc2) |
|
590 | 590
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/12 2:25 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacqueline L. James (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25564106) Filed by Creditor Spirit Realty, L.P. (James, Jacqueline) |
|
589 | 589
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 1:56 PM
Objection Limited Objection to Cure Notice . Filed by Forum Lone Star, L.P. (Baum, Kenneth) |
|
588 | 588
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 1:36 PM
Objection of Google LLC to Notice of Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and Cure Costs . Filed by Google LLC (Vulpio, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
587 | 587
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 1:36 PM
Objection Limited Objection to Cure Notice . Filed by Columbus Park Crossing, LLC (Baum, Kenneth) |
|
586 | 586
misc
Certificate
Thu 09/12 1:26 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By HCL Goodyear Centerpointe, LLC ) (Coulson, Dawn) |
|
585 | 585
court
Letter
Thu 09/12 1:04 PM
Letter/Objection Received by the Court from Meridian Associates, LLC, C/O VITA & VITA REALTY CORP (tjl4) |
|
584 | 584
misc
Response
Thu 09/12 12:59 PM
Response (Filed By KRG Lake Worth Towne Crossing, LLC ) (Bogdanowicz, Mark) |
|
583 | 583
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 12:57 PM
Objection OBJECTION OF HAAGEN COMPANY, LLC, TO NOTICE OF POTENTIAL ASSUMPTION OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS OR UNEXPIRED LEASES AND CURE AMOUNTS . Filed by HCL Goodyear Centerpointe, LLC (Coulson, Dawn) |
|
582 | 582
misc
Response
Thu 09/12 12:07 PM
Response (Filed By International Speedway Square, Ltd. ) (Bogdanowicz, Mark) |
|
581 | 581
misc
Certificate
Thu 09/12 12:03 PM
Certificate of Service of Nadia Alazri (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
580 | 580
misc
Certificate
Thu 09/12 11:51 AM
Certificate of Service of Betina Wheelon (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
579 | 579
misc
Certificate
Thu 09/12 11:38 AM
Certificate of Service of Nadia Alazri (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
578 | 578
misc
Declaration
Thu 09/12 11:36 AM
Declaration re: Declaration of Kevin Ramirez in Support of Objection of Salesforce, Inc. to the Proposed Assumption of Executory Contracts and Cure Costs and Reservation of Rights (Filed By Salesforce, Inc. ) (Prostok, Jeffrey) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
577 | 577
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 11:33 AM
Objection of Salesforce, Inc. to the Proposed Assumption of Executory Contracts and Cure Costs and Reservation of Rights . Filed by Salesforce, Inc. (Prostok, Jeffrey) |
|
576 | 576
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Thu 09/12 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Nicholas Zugaro Filed by on behalf of Fidelitone Freight Forwarding Services, LLC, Fidelitone Last Mile Brokerage, LLC (Zugaro, Nicholas) |
|
575 | 575
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/12 11:09 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Christina Grey Myer (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25563257) Filed by Creditor Horne-River Ridge II, L.P. (Myer, Christina) |
|
574 | 574
answer
Objection
Thu 09/12 7:43 AM
Objection and Reservation of Rights of WPG Legacy, LLC to the Notice of (I) Potential Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases and (II) Cure Amounts and Proposed Sale . Filed by WPG Legacy, LLC (Matthews, Rebecca) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
trustee
Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held
Thu 09/12 11:54 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor appeared. Hearing concluded (Ruff, Jayson) |
||
Wednesday, September 11, 2024 | ||
573 | 573
misc
Certificate
Wed 09/11 10:46 PM
Certificate of Service of Nadia Alazri (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
572 | 572
answer
Objection
Wed 09/11 9:02 PM
Objection LIMITED OBJECTION OF CLAYTON VENTURE, LLC TO NOTICE OF (I) POTENTIAL ASSUMPTION AND ASSIGNMENT OF EXECUTORY CONTRACTS AND UNEXPIRED LEASES AND (II) CURE AMOUNTS RELATING TO DEBTORS STORE NUMBER 760 LOCATED AT 525 W. BRANDON BLVD., BRANDON, FL 33511 . Filed by Clayton Venture LLC (Rashti, Donna) |
|
571 | 571
misc
Certificate
Wed 09/11 5:46 PM
Certificate of Service of Betina Wheelon (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
570 | 570
misc
Statement
Wed 09/11 5:27 PM
Statement -- Amended Verified Statement of Kean Miller LLP Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 2019 (Filed By Ad Hoc Group of Badcock Dealers ) (Lim, Lloyd) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
569 | 569
order
Resetting Hearing
Wed 09/11 8:57 AM
Order Resetting Hearing before Judge Alfredo R Perez. Signed on 9/11/2024 Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2024 at 10:00 AM at telephone and video conference. (abm4) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
568 | 568
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/10 9:32 PM
Stipulation By Conn's, Inc. and Synchrony Bank. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Conn's, Inc. ) (Okin, Matthew) |
|
567 | 567
motion
Employ
Tue 09/10 8:06 PM
Application to Employ Okin Adams Bartlett Curry LLP as Conflict Counsel to Debtors. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Debtor Conn's, Inc. (McFaul, Duston) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
566 | 566
misc
Certificate
Tue 09/10 3:24 PM
Certificate of Service of Betina Wheelon (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
565 | 565
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 09/10 3:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brendon D Singh Filed by on behalf of (SA-Conn's) Woori Investments (Singh, Brendon) |
|
564 | 564
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Tue 09/10 3:13 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Brendon D Singh Filed by on behalf of (DFW-Conn's) JS & ME Investments (Singh, Brendon) |
|
563 | 563
misc
Debtors Master Service List
Tue 09/10 2:42 PM
Debtors Master Service List (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ). (Garabato, Sid) |
|
562 | 562
misc
Certificate
Tue 09/10 1:45 PM
Certificate of Service of Betina Wheelon (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
561 | 561
misc
Certificate
Tue 09/10 11:40 AM
Certificate of Service of Betina Wheelon (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |
|
560 | 560
misc
Exhibit List
Tue 09/10 8:45 AM
Exhibit List (Filed By Nahomi Sanchez ). (Rodriguez, Ronald) |
|
559 | 559
1
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 09/10 8:10 AM
Order Granting Motion for John A. Morris To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/10/2024. (abm4) |
|
558 | 558
2
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 09/10 8:08 AM
Order Granting Motion for Todd H. Surden To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/10/2024. (abm4) |
|
557 | 557
2
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 09/10 8:05 AM
Order Granting Motion for Todd H. Surden To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/10/2024. (abm4) |
|
556 | 556
2
pgs
order
Order to Appear pro hac vice
Tue 09/10 8:01 AM
Order Granting Motion for Todd H. Surden To Appear pro hac vice Note: Instructions to request Texas Southern CM/ECF registration through PACER are found [LINK:here] Signed on 9/10/2024. (abm4) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
555 | 555
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 09/09 9:19 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Amended Statement of Financial Affairs of W.S. Badcock LLC Case No. 24-90430 (Filed By Conn's, Inc. ). (McFaul, Duston) |
|
554 | 554
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 09/09 9:16 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Amended Statement of Financial Affairs of Conn Appliances, Inc. Case No. 24-90423 (Filed By Conn's, Inc. ). (McFaul, Duston) |
|
553 | 553
misc
Creditor Request for Notices
Mon 09/09 5:37 PM
Creditor Request for Notices (Filed By Oracle America, Inc. ). (Christianson, Shawn) |
|
552 | 552
misc
Declaration
Mon 09/09 3:54 PM
Declaration re: Amended Declaration of Disinterestedness of Akerman LLP Pursuant to the Order Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business (Filed By Conn's, Inc. ) (McFaul, Duston) |
|
551 | 551
misc
Response
Mon 09/09 3:38 PM
Response (Filed By Bell West, LLC ) (Bartley, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Lease Agreement | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Cure Amount Statement | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
550 | 550
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 09/09 10:45 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John A. Morris (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25553035) Filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (Warner, Michael) |
|
549 | 549
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 09/09 9:16 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd H. Surden (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25552721) Filed by Creditor Rainier Wheatland Acquisitions, LLC (Surden, Todd) |
|
548 | 548
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 09/09 9:13 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd H. Surden (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25552704) Filed by Creditor Rainier SA Crossing Acquisitions, LLC (Surden, Todd) |
|
547 | 547
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 09/09 9:10 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Todd H. Surden (Fee Paid: $100, receipt number A25552673) Filed by Creditor Bealls Stores, Inc. a/k/a Bealls Department Stores Inc. (Surden, Todd) |
|
546 | 546
answer
Objection
Mon 09/09 9:08 AM
Joint Objection to Cure Amount (Conn's Location 140) . Filed by Tropicana Centre LV TIC 11, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 10, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 9, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 8, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 7, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 6, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 5, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 4, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 3, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 2, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV TIC 1, LLC, FNRP Realty Advisors, LLC, Tropicana Centre LV, LLC (Levant, William) |
|
Sunday, September 08, 2024 | ||
545 | 545
misc
Certificate
Sun 09/08 9:40 PM
Certificate of Service of Nadia Alazri (Filed By Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC ) (Garabato, Sid) |