Hanretty v. Commissioner of Social Security
New York Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mitchell J Katz |
Case #: | 6:24-cv-00904 |
Nature of Suit | 863 Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g)) |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC) |
Case Filed: | Jul 22, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 23, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Initial Attorney Appearance - Commissioner
Tue 07/23 6:11 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - COMMISSIONER: Jason P. Peck appearing for Commissioner of Social Security. Social Security Administrative Transcript due by 10/21/2024. (Peck, Jason) |
|
4 | 4
misc
G.O. 18 & SSA Case Assignment Form
Tue 07/23 1:38 PM
Social Security Appeal Case Assignment Form and General Order #18 Issued. Pursuant to General Order #18, in the event the United States timely withdraws its consent the case will be reassigned to a District Judge consistent with General Order #12 . (see) |
|
misc
Clerk Correction of Docket Entry
Tue 07/23 1:23 PM
CLERK'S CORRECTION OF DOCKET ENTRY re1 Complaint - Social Security Appeal: Corrected file date to 7/22/2024. (see) |
||
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Consent / Declination Form
Tue 07/23 1:35 PM
SOCIAL SECURITY CONSENT FORM filed by Jamie Hanretty advising of consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (see) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Social Security Identification Form - [LODGED]
Tue 07/23 1:27 PM
Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited] . (see) |
|
1 | 1
cmpssa
Complaint - Social Security Appeal
Tue 07/23 1:22 PM
COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 2(A), 2(B) and 2(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANYNDC-6807523).(see) Modified on 7/23/2024 (see, ) |
|
Att: 1 Appeals Council Decision, | ||
Att: 2 Fee Agreement, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |